Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWilderness Watch, Inc. v. Bureau of Land Management
DistrictDistrict of Montana
CityMissoula
Case Number9:2017cv00028
Date Filed2017-03-06
Date Closed2017-08-30
JudgeJudge Donald W. Molloy
PlaintiffWilderness Watch, Inc.
Case DescriptionWilderness Watch submitted eight FOIA requests to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning grazing allotments in designated wilderness areas managed by BLM. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after the agency failed to respond to its request, Wilderness Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBureau of Land Management an agency within the U.S. Department of Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [6]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-061COMPLAINT against Bureau of Land Management, filed by Wilderness Watch, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJH) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-06Filing fee of $ 400.00 paid; receipt number 0977-1915788. (KJH) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-072Summons Issued as to Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (original mailed to Plaintiff's counsel) (KJH) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-133Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wilderness Watch, Inc.. (Johnson, Dana) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-214SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilderness Watch, Inc.. Bureau of Land Management served on 3/16/2017, answer due 5/15/2017. (Attachments: # 1 US Attorney Service, # 2 US Attorney General Service) (Johnson, Dana) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-08-255STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wilderness Watch, Inc.. (Johnson, Dana) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-306ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Bureau of Land Management shall pay Plaintiff Wilderness Watch's attorney's fees and costs in the agreed-upon amount of $3,659.35. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/30/2017. (NOS) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff