Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDoung v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2017cv00343
Date Filed2017-03-06
Date Closed2017-07-19
JudgeU.S. District Judge John C Coughenour
PlaintiffWilliam Doung
Case DescriptionWilliam Doung submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Service for records concerning himself, his spouse, and his attempts to have her immigrate to the United States from Cambodia. Her visa application was denied because of fraud. Doung then submitted a FOIA request to USCIS for records pertaining to the fraud allegation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Doung filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [11]
Opinion/Order [13]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-061COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-4793765) Attorney Robert H. Gibbs added to party William Doung(pty:pla), filed by William Doung. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gibbs, Robert) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-07U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (RE) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-072Summons electronically issued as to defendant(s) United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: # 1 Summons-General Counsel, # 2 Summons-US Attorney)(RE) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-083ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-094MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. The nature of the case; 2. The status of matters which are presently set before the Court, e.g., hearings, motions, etc.; 3. The status of discovery and a time schedule for its completion; 4. A statement of any legal issues about which motions are contemplated and a possible briefing schedule; 5. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 6. Whether the case is jury or non-jury; 7. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 8. Settlement probabilities; and 9. Whether the parties consent to proceed to trial before an assigned magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, arrangements may be made to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) days prior to the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 6/13/2017 at 0:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-135PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Attorney General, US by Plaintiff William Doung (Attachments: # 1 Summons Attorney General)(Gibbs, Robert) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-146Summons issued electronically as to defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (PM) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
2017-04-107NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tricia S. Boerger on behalf of Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Boerger, Tricia) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-108ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Boerger, Tricia) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-109AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to illegible on 3/8/2017, filed by Plaintiff William Doung. (Gibbs, Robert) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-06-0710Stipulated MOTION To Strike Status Conference and Proposed Order , filed by Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Noting Date 6/7/2017, (Boerger, Tricia) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-0811MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 10 Stipulated Motion to vacate the status conference set for June 13, 2017. If this matter does not resolve by June 17, 2017, the parties are DIRECTED to submit a stipulated briefing schedule for consideration by the Court. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-06-2012Joint Stipulated MOTION Setting Briefing Schedule , filed by Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Noting Date 6/20/2017, (Boerger, Tricia) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-2113MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Stipulated Motion to set briefing schedule; plaintiff's opening brief shall designate a noting date of 9/15/17, opening brief due 8/10/17; response due 9/1/17; reply due 9/15/17 by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-07-1814STIPULATION for Dismissal, Rule 41 by parties (Gibbs, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-19***Civil Case Terminated per 14 Joint Stipulation and Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), without prejudice. (PM) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff