Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePower Constructors, Inc. v. U.S. Department of Labor
DistrictDistrict of Idaho
CityDatabaseVersion 6.1 Boise - Southern
Case Number1:2017cv00102
Date Filed2017-03-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ronald E. Bush
PlaintiffPower Constructors, Inc.
Case DescriptionPower Constructors submitted a FOIA request to the Occupational Safety and Health Administration for records concerning the agency's investigation of a 2013 high-voltage electrical accident in Kansas that resulted in the death of a utility worker and the injury of another utility worker. The agency disclosed 350 pages with redactions under Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Power Constructors filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the company filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Labor
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-071COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against U.S. Department of Labor ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1557768.), filed by Power Constructors, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to U.S. Attorney for District of Kansas, # 3 Summons to Attorney General of U.S., # 4 Summons to U.S. Department of Labor)(Miller, Brad)
2017-03-072MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Thomas R. Buchanan. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1557777.)Brad P Miller appearing for Plaintiff Power Constructors, Inc.. Responses due by 3/28/2017 (Miller, Brad)
2017-03-073MOTION for Summary Judgment - Power Constructors, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment Brad P Miller appearing for Plaintiff Power Constructors, Inc.. Responses due by 3/28/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Thomas R. Buchanan in Support, # 3 Exhibits 1 - 4 to Declaration, # 4 Exhibits 5 - 8 to Declaration, # 5 Exhibits 9 - 20 to Declaration, # 6 Exhibits 21 - 26 to Declaration, # 7 Exhibits 27 - 43 to Declaration)(Miller, Brad)
2017-03-084DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving 2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Thomas R Buchanan for Power Constructors, Inc. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
2017-03-085Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Labor, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(cjs)
2017-03-106Corporate Disclosure Statement by Power Constructors, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Power Holdings, Inc. for Power Constructors, Inc... (Miller, Brad)
2017-03-107Summons Reissued as to U.S. Department of Labor. (cjs)
2017-03-148SUMMONS Returned Executed by Power Constructors, Inc.. U.S. Department of Labor served on 3/13/2017, answer due 5/12/2017. (Miller, Brad) Modified on 3/14/2017 to correct answer due from 4/3/2017 to 5/12/2017 pursuant to Corrective Entry (cjs).
2017-03-149CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Power Constructors, Inc. re 3 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Power Constructors, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment , 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Miller, Brad)
2017-03-14CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number 8 Summons Returned Executed filed by Power Constructors, Inc. was filed incorrectly in this case as the wrong event was used. The correct event is "Summons Returned Executed as to USA" as the answer deadline is different. No action is needed by the filing party as the Clerk's Office will edit the entry and correct the answer deadline. (cjs)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff