Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00421
Date Filed2017-03-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the conversation between then-Attorney General Loretta Lynch and former President Bill Clinton. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-081COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4869669) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons DOJ)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-082LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-08Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (sth) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-093SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-094STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/9/2017. (lcrdm1, ) Modified on 3/9/2017 (kt). (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-04-045RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/27/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/26/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/20/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/20/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-04-266ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Lee, Jason) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-26MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on May 2, 2017, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 21. The parties are further ORDERED to meet and confer prior to the status conference to discuss scheduling for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/26/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-26Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/2/2017 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (dot) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-277Unopposed MOTION Reschedule Status Conference by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-05-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Motion to Reschedule Status Conference 7 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. The status conference currently scheduled for May 2, 2017, is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for May 3, 2017, at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/1/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-01Set/Reset Hearings: The Status Conference set for 5/2/2017 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 5/3/2017, at 3:30 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-03Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 5/3/2017. Joint Status Report due by 5/17/2017, which shall include Defendant's best estimate of the number of potentially responsive records; A further Joint Status Report is due on or before 8/2/2017, which shall include any outstanding issues, and a proposed briefing schedule if necessary. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook). (kt) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-158Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-08-029Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-03MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further joint status report on or before August 23, 2017, informing the Court as to any outstanding issues, and, if necessary, providing a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/3/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/23/2017. (kt) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-2310Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-08-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 10 , the parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the following briefing schedule: (1) Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before October 27, 2017; (2) Plaintiff shall file its cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before December 1, 2017; (3) Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment on or before January 5, 2018; (4) Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before January 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/24/2017. (lcrdm1) Modified on 8/24/2017 to complete numbering sequence (kt). (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's motion for summary judgment due on or before 10/27/2017; Plaintiff's -motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment due on or before 12/1/2017; Defendant's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment due on or before 1/5/2018; Plaintiff's reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment due on or before 1/19/2018. (kt) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-10-2611Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-10-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Summary Judgment Briefing Deadline 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before November 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/30/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before 11/10/2017. (kt) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-11-1012MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Jason) (Entered: 11/10/2017)
2017-12-0113RESPONSE re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff