Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleE.G. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00425
Date Filed2017-03-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffE.G.
Case DescriptionE.G. testified at the request of the Air Force at a discharge hearing at Elgin Air Force Base concerning charges of sexual assault committed by Sgt. John Broome. The board decided to allow Broome to continue in the Air Force. E.G. then submitted a FOIA request to the Air Force for records concerning the board's proceedings concerning Broome. The Air Force disclosed E.G.'s own testimony, but claimed the rest of the records were protected by Exemption 5 (privileges) and Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). E.G. filed an administrative appeal. The Air Force agreed that Exemption 5 did not apply, but that the records were still exempt under Exemption 6. E.G. then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Exemption 6 - Invasion of privacy, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE SAF/CGA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-091MOTION To Use Pseudonym and Place Case Under Seal by E.G. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(jf) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-092ORDER granted-in-part 1 MOTION To Use Pseudonym and Place Case Under Seal; further ordered, plaintiff may proceed under a pseudonym at this time; further ordered, Complaint bearing plaintiff's full name, and the exhibits are sealed. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 03/09/2017. (see order for full detail) (jf) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-093COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616083464) filed by E.G.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (redacted), # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Exhibit Sealed Complaint, # 4 Exhibit B (sealed)) (jf). (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-09SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
2017-03-104MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Peter J. Coote, :Firm- Pennoni Associates, Inc., :Address- 3001 Market Street, Suite 200, Philadelphia, PA 19104. Phone No. - 215-254-7857. Fee Status: Fee Paid. receipt number 4616083481 by E.G. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-205ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/20/17. (zlsj) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-04-046RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE served on 3/22/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/22/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/22/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/21/2017.) (zrdj) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
2017-04-217ANSWER to 3 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE.(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-05-028ORDER directing Defendant to file any dispositive motion within 10 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/2/17. (lsj) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-119Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-2610Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-3011ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered that Defendant shall have to, and including, May 26, 2017, to files its motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/25/17. (lsj) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-06-0712Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-1213Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-1314MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Mitchell Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B - Vaught Declaration and Attachment A thereto, # 3 Exhibit B (continued) - Attachments B to D, # 4 Exhibit C - Varela Declaration)(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff