Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleU.S. RIGHT TO KNOW et al v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00423
Date Filed2017-03-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffU.S. RIGHT TO KNOW
PlaintiffCAREY GILLAM
Case DescriptionU.S. Right to Know submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning a cancer assessment review committee report on glyphosate and communications with Monsanto concerning glyphosate. U.S. Right to Know also requested a fee waiver. The agency denied the request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, U.S. Right to Know filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-091COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4870081) filed by CAREY GILLAM, U.S. RIGHT TO KNOW. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Clattenburg, Rachel) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-09Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (jd) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-092SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-093RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/9/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/8/2017. (Clattenburg, Rachel) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-094LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by U.S. RIGHT TO KNOW (Clattenburg, Rachel) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-04-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 3/13/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Clattenburg, Rachel) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
2017-04-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/13/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Clattenburg, Rachel) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
2017-04-077GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 7, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-078NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-109ANSWER to Complaint by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-12MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule governing further proceedings on or before May 3, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 12, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint proposed schedule due by 5/3/2017. (hs) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-1310NOTICE of Appearance by Adina H. Rosenbaum on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-1911NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CAREY GILLAM, U.S. RIGHT TO KNOW. Attorney Rachel M. Clattenburg terminated. (Clattenburg, Rachel) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-05-0312Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule for Disclosure by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-08MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Proposed Schedule for Disclosure, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that: (1) the defendant shall review 750-1,250 documents per month; (2) the defendant shall produce the non-exempt portions of those records on the 20th day of each month; (3) the defendant shall conclude review and production of all responsive records on or before October 31, 2017; and (4) the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before September 1, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 8, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/1/2017 (hs) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-06-1513NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D. Llewellyn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-08-3014Joint STATUS REPORT by CAREY GILLAM, U.S. RIGHT TO KNOW. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-08-30MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before November 17, 2017, indicating what issues, if any, remain outstanding following the completion of production. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 30, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-08-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/17/2017 (hs) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-09-2015MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete September Review and Production of Documents by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-2016RESPONSE re 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete September Review and Production of Documents filed by CAREY GILLAM, U.S. RIGHT TO KNOW. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-21MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 15 Defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall complete its September production on or before October 4, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 21, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-09-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Review and Production of documents due by 10/4/2017. (hs) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-11-1717Joint STATUS REPORT by CAREY GILLAM, U.S. RIGHT TO KNOW. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-20MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before December 20, 2017, indicating what issues, if any, remain for litigation. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 20, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/20/2017 (hs) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-12-04Case directly reassigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Judge Reggie B. Walton is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff