Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCox v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
DistrictEastern District of New York
CityBrooklyn
Case Number1:2017cv01337
Date Filed2017-03-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Pamela K. Chen
PlaintiffDouglas Cox
Case DescriptionDouglas Cox, a law library professor at the City University of New York Law School, submitted FOIA requests to the CIA and National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning the congressional investigation of torture. NARA responded to his first request for communications between the CIA and NARA, by disclosing NARA's discussions, but withholding those by the CIA. Cox appealed the decision to NARA, but his appeal remained unresolved by the time he filed suit. Both the CIA and NARA acknowledged Cox's requests, but after neither agency responded, Cox filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency
DefendantNational Archives and Records Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-091COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9353205 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Cox Douglas. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Proposed Summons) (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-10NOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions in NY-E Division of Business Rule 50.1(d)(2) section on the second page. This document can be found under the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-102Civil Cover Sheet.. by Douglas Cox (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-10Case assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-103Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 National summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-134In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-135This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-226SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Cox. Central Intelligence Agency served on 3/21/2017, answer due 5/22/2017. (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
2017-03-227SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Cox. National Archives and Records Administration served on 3/21/2017, answer due 5/22/2017. (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
2017-04-208ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Central Intelligence Agency, National Archives and Records Administration. (Elliot, Stephen) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-05-049SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person status conference will be held at 10:30 a.m. on June 5, 2017 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. The plaintiff and counsel for the defendant must attend. Counsel for defendant is directed to immediately forward a copy of this Order to the plaintiff, who is proceeding pro se, via return receipt delivery and file proof of service with the Court. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 5/4/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Chambers Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia) (Main Document 9 replaced on 5/4/2017) (Gillespie, Saudia). (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-0410Letter to the Court by Douglas Cox (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-0511DECLARATION of Service by Central Intelligence Agency, National Archives and Records Administration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Elliot, Stephen) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-06-0512Minute Entry: Initial Conference Hearing held on 6/5/2017 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Cox for plaintiff, Elliot for defendants. Defendants report that they anticipate making substantial progress in processing plaintiff's FOIA requests over the next six weeks. OUNSEL WILL SUBMIT A STATUS REPORT BY JULY 13. THE COURT WILL HOLD A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AT 12:00 NOON ON JULY 17, 2017. Counsel for the government will arrange the conference call. (Gillespie, Saudia) (Tape #10:29-10:56.) (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-07-1313STATUS REPORT by Central Intelligence Agency, National Archives and Records Administration (Elliot, Stephen) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-1314STATUS REPORT by Douglas Cox (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-14ORDER: The telephone conference set for July 17, 2017 will proceed as scheduled. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to arrange the call with all parties on the line then call chambers at 718-613-2560. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 7/14/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-1715Minute Entry: Telephone Conference held on 7/17/2017 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Cox, plaintiff pro se; Elliott for defendants. The parties report that disclosures are being made at an appropriate pace. Defendants anticipate completing their search for responsive documents within four weeks. Accordingly, THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT UPDATED STATUS REPORTS BY AUGUST 15, 2017. The status reports shall propose a date by which the parties will be ready to participate in a conference with the Court to determine the next steps in the litigation. (Tape #12:0-12:04.) (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-08-1516STATUS REPORT by Central Intelligence Agency, National Archives and Records Administration (Elliot, Stephen) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-1517STATUS REPORT by Douglas Cox (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-16STATUS REPORT ORDER: Counsel shall file an updated status report letter by September 12, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 8/16/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
2017-09-1218STATUS REPORT by Central Intelligence Agency, National Archives and Records Administration (Elliot, Stephen) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-1219STATUS REPORT by Douglas Cox (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-13STATUS REPORT ORDER: Application 18 is hereby approved. Counsel shall submit a joint status report letter by November 3, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 9/13/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-11-0320STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Central Intelligence Agency, National Archives and Records Administration (Elliot, Stephen) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
2017-11-09STATUS REPORT ORDER: Counsel shall submit a joint status report letter by December 18, 2017. The status reports shall propose a date by which the parties will be ready to participate in a conference with the Court to determine the next steps in the litigation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 11/9/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff