Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00443
Date Filed2017-03-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionEnergy & Environmental Legal Institute submitted a FOIA request to the National Institute for Environmental Health Sciences for records concerning the agency's risk assessment of the chemical Glyphosate. EELI also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, EELI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-131COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4873490) filed by ENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Civil Process Clerk of US Attorney, # 3 Summons To Dept of Health and Human Services, # 4 Summons to Attorney General)(Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-13Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (md) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-132SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-133GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/13/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-04-204NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-04-205Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-04-26MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint by 5/24/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 4/26/2017. (lckbj3) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff