Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00444
Date Filed2017-03-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted three FOIA requests to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning the agency's obligations to taxpayers under the Affordable Care Act. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency on any of its requests, Cause of Action Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantCENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-131COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4873891) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons Medicare, # 9 Summons HHS, # 10 Summons AG, # 11 Summons Clerk)(Steven, Lee) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-132Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-133NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia Fleming Crawford on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Crawford, Cynthia) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-13Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (md) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-134SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-215RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/20/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/19/2017. (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-216RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/20/2017. (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-217RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 3/20/2017 (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-218RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES served on 3/17/2017 (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-04-189NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-1810Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-19MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before May 19, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/19/2017. (lccrc3) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/19/2017. (zlsj) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-05-1911ANSWER to Complaint by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-22MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. Because the requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure do not apply, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by June 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/22/2017. (lccrc3) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
2017-05-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule or Disclosure due by 6/5/2017. (lsj) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
2017-06-0512Joint STATUS REPORT (Proposed Schedule) by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-06MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a joint status report on Defendant's ongoing production efforts on or before August 11, 2017. It is further ORDERED that the parties file additional joint status reports every sixty days thereafter until the document production is complete. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/6/2017. (lccrc3) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/11/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff