Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00478
Date Filed2017-03-16
Date Closed2017-08-18
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning communications between FBI agents and former FBI assistant director James Kallstrom. The FBI issued a Glomar response, neither confirming nor denying the existence of records. CREW filed an administrative appeal. The Office of Information Policy upheld the FBI's decision and CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-161COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4877650) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Dep't of Justice, # 4 Summons Attorney General)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-03-162LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-03-16Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (sb) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-03-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-04-244ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/24/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/23/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Postage Receipts)(Weismann, Anne) Modified on 4/24/2017 (jf). (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-245RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/17/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/17/2017. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-24NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 4 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, was entered in error and will be refiled in the correct case. (jf) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-246RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/17/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/17/2017 (jf) (See Docket Entry 5 to view document) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-05-177ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Baer, Michael) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-18MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule by June 1, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/18/2017. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-18NOTICE OF ERROR re 7 ANSWER to Complaint; -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refiled document. 2. Exhibits cannot be viewed; "Out of memory" error received; Please refile exhibits as attachments to an Errata. (znmw, ) Modified on 5/19/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Briefing Schedule due by 6/1/2017. (hs) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-188ERRATA by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE 7 Answer to Complaint filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Baer, Michael) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/18/2017) (td). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/18/2017) (td). (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/18/2017) (td). (Attachment 4 replaced on 5/18/2017) (td). Modified on 5/18/2017 (td). (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-06-019Joint STATUS REPORT by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-01MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposed schedule in 9 the parties' Joint Status Report: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a status report, including a proposed briefing schedule, by June 29, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/1/2017. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/29/2017 (hs) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-2910Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Baer, Michael) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-29MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposed schedule in 10 the parties' Joint Status Report: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a status report, including a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings in this case, by July 29, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/29/2017. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint status report, including a proposed schedule due by 7/29/2017 (gdf) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-07-2811Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Baer, Michael) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-28MINUTE ORDER adopting the parties' proposal in 11 their joint status report: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report by August 25, 2017, unless by that time the parties have submitted a joint stipulation of dismissal. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/28/2017. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-08-1812STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
2017-08-18MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to 12 the parties' Settlement Agreement and Release, it is hereby ORDERED that the case is dismissed under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/18/2017. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff