Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. U.S. Department Of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2017cv01946
Date Filed2017-03-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge P. Kevin Castel
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffCharlie Savage
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporter Charlie Savage submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Legal Counsel at the Department of Justice for records concerning review of President Trump's executive orders or his staffing of the White House. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department Of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-161COMPLAINT against U.S. Department Of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13430763)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-03-162CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-03-163RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Grupo Finaciero Inbursa, S.A.B. de C.V. for The New York Times Company. Document filed by The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-03-164REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-03-165NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ian MacDougall on behalf of Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (MacDougall, Ian) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-03-17CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-17Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (pc) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-17Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-176ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department Of Justice. (pc) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-04-047ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/18/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/4/2017) (cf) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-04-118NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Sol Tinio on behalf of U.S. Department Of Justice. (Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-289ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by U.S. Department Of Justice.(Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-07-1210LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Rebecca S. Tinio dated July 12, 2017 re: Case Summary and Request to Endorse Proposed Agreed Deadlines. Document filed by U.S. Department Of Justice.(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-1311MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 10 Letter filed by U.S. Department Of Justice. ENDORSEMENT: The proposed schedule is approved. The July 18 conference is adjourned to Oct. 6, 2017 at 10:45am. (Initial Conference set for 10/6/2017 at 10:45 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 7/12/2017) (cf) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-09-1112LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Rebecca S. Tinio dated September 11, 2017 re: Status Report and Request for Leave to Submit Further Status Report. Document filed by U.S. Department Of Justice.(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-1213MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 12 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Rebecca S. Tinio dated September 11, 2017 re: Status Report and Request for Leave to Submit Further Status Report. Document filed by U.S. Department Of Justice. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So ordered. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/11/2017) (rjm) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-10-0214LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Rebecca S. Tinio dated October 2, 2017 re: Joint Status Report and Request for Leave to Submit Further Status Report. Document filed by U.S. Department Of Justice.(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-0315MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 14 Letter filed by U.S. Department Of Justice. ENDORSEMENT: Adopted. The parties agreements are adopted as the Order of this Court. Conference is adjourned from October 6 to Nov. 30, 2017 at 11:30 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 11/30/2017 at 11:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/3/2017) (cf) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-0616NOTICE OF WITHDRAW AL OF COUNSEL. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT, as of September 18, 2017, Ian MacDougall is no longer with the Legal Department of The New York Times Company and hereby withdraws his appearance as counsel for Plaintiffs The New York Times Company and Charlie Savage in the above-captioned litigation and requests that his name be removed from the Court's and the parties' service lists. David E. McCraw continues to serve as Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs, and all future correspondence and papers in this action should continue to be directed to him. Application for Ian MacDougall to withdraw is granted. So ordered. Attorney Ian MacDougall terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/6/2017) (rjm) Modified on 11/14/2017 (rjm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-11-1517LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Rebecca S. Tinio dated November 15, 2017 re: Joint Status Report and Request for Leave to Submit Further Status Report. Document filed by U.S. Department Of Justice.(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-1518MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 17 Letter filed by U.S. Department Of Justice. ENDORSEMENT: Conference Adjourned From: November 30, 2017 To: Jan. 23, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 1/23/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/15/2017) (cf) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2018-01-1919LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Rebecca S. Tinio dated January 19, 2018 re: Joint Status Report and Request for Leave to Submit Further Status Report. Document filed by U.S. Department Of Justice.(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-01-2220ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The initial conference scheduled for January 23, 2018 is adjourned to March 20, 2018 at 1:45 p.m. in Courtroom 11D at 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY. Initial Conference set for 3/20/2018 at 01:45 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/22/2018) (cf) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-03-0221LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Rebecca S. Tinio dated March 2, 2018 re: Request for Extension of Time. Document filed by U.S. Department Of Justice.(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-0222MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 21 Letter filed by U.S. Department Of Justice. ENDORSEMENT: Schedule and proposed actions are adopted as an Order of this Court. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/2/2018) (cf) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-1323LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David E. McCraw dated March 13, 2018 re: Request for Adjournment. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-1424MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 23 Letter filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage. ENDORSEMENT: Conference adjourned from March 20 to April 6, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 4/6/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/13/2018) (cf) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-26NOTICE: The conference originally scheduled for April 6, 2018 is moved to April 2, 2018 at 11:15 a.m. in Courtroom 11D. (Nacanther, Florence) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-2725LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Rebecca S. Tinio dated March 27, 2018 re: Joint Status Report and Request for Leave to Submit Further Joint Status Report. Document filed by U.S. Department Of Justice.(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-03-2926MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 25 Letter filed by U.S. Department Of Justice. ENDORSEMENT: The parties agreements are approved and adopted to this Court's Order. Conference adjourned from April 2 to June 1, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 6/1/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/29/2018) (cf) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-05-0727LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Rebecca S. Tinio dated May 7, 2018 re: Status Report and Request for Leave to Submit Further Status Report. Document filed by U.S. Department Of Justice.(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-0928MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 27 Letter filed by U.S. Department Of Justice. ENDORSEMENT: The agreement of the parties is adopted as an order of the Court. The June 1 conference is adjourned to September 4, 2018 at 2 PM. (Initial Conference set for 9/4/2018 at 02:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/9/2018) (cf) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-1529LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Rebecca S. Tinio dated May 15, 2018 re: Request to Reschedule Conference. Document filed by U.S. Department Of Justice.(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-1630MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 29 Letter Request to Reschedule Conference, filed by U.S. Department Of Justice. ENDORSEMENT: Conference adjourned from 9/4/2018 to August 28, 2018 at 12p.m. So Ordered., (Initial Conference set for 8/28/2018 at 12:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/15/18) (yv) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff