Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00501
Date Filed2017-03-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for records concerning a coding error in the calculation of repayment rate data in the College Scorecard. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-201COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4881544) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Department of Education)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-202LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-20Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (sth) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-203SUMMONS(3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-274RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/27/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/26/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/27/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 3/24/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of C. Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-04-075GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 7, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-116NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-267ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION.(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-26MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule governing the production of requested documents and the filing of dispositive motions on or before May 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 26, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint proposed briefing schedule due by 5/10/2017. (hs) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-05-108Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-17MINUTE ORDER. In accordance with the 8 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that this case shall proceed as follows: (1) the defendant shall complete its disclosure of responsive documents or portions of documents and provide to the plaintiff's counsel a Vaughn index on or before June 8, 2017; (2) the plaintiff shall identify any redactions or withholdings that remain in dispute and any other pending issues on or before July 10, 2017; (3) the parties shall attempt to resolve any pending disputes on or before August 10, 2017; (4) the defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before September 11, 2017; (5) the plaintiff shall file an opposition to the defendant's motion and a cross-motion for summary judgment on or before October 11, 2017; (6) the defendant shall file a reply in support of its motion and an opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion on or before November 9, 2017; and (7) the plaintiff shall a reply in support of its cross-motion on or before November 30, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 17, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Vaughn Index due by 6/8/2017, Summary Judgment motion due by 9/11/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/11/2017, Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/9/2017, Reply due by 11/30/2017. (hs) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-07-129STIPULATION of Dismissal And Settlement by DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-13MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 9 Stipulation of Settlement and Dismissal, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 13, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff