Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00509
Date Filed2017-03-21
Date Closed2017-09-07
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning coomunications received by agency employees using the app Signal. Cause of Action Institute also requested a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied Cause of Action Institute's request for expedited processing and told Cause of Action that the cost of responding would be less than the minimum amount chargeable. Cause of Action Institute filed an administrative appeal pertaining to the denial of its request for expedited processing. The agency upheld its decision on expedited processing. Cause of Action Institute then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-211COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4883481) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons EPA, # 8 Summons AG, # 9 Summons Clerk)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-212Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-213NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-21Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (md) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-214SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-275RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 3/27/2017 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-03-276RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/27/2017. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-03-277RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/27/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/26/2017. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-04-268ANSWER to Complaint by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-279ORDER: Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before May 12, 2017. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Amit P. Mehta on 04/27/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-04-27Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/12/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-05-1210Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (March 22, 2017 letter))(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-05-15MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report, on or before May 25, 2017, that proposes a schedule for further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/15/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-15Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/25/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-05-2511Joint STATUS REPORT by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-3012ORDER setting the schedule for further proceedings in this matter: (1) Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment on or before July 13, 2017; (2) Plaintiff shall file its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion on or before August 16, 2017; (3) Defendant shall file its Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on or before September 12, 2017; and (4) Plaintiff shall file its Reply on or before October 3, 2017. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/30/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-05-30Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 7/13/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/16/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/12/2017. Plaintiff's Cross Motion due by 8/16/2017. Response to Cross Motion due by 9/12/2017. Reply to Cross Motion due by 10/3/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-07-0513Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and for Adjustment of Briefing Schedule by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-06MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. The court sets the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before August 15, 2017; Plaintiffs Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before September 18, 2017; Defendant's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before October 12, 2017; and Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before November 7, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/06/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment due by 8/15/2017. Plaintiffs Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment And Opposition To Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment due by 9/18/2017. Defendant's Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment And Opposition To Plaintiff's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment due by 10/12/2017. Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Its Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment due by 11/7/2017. (mac) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-08-0914Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and for Adjustment of Briefing Schedule by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-10MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment and Adjustment of Briefing Schedule. The court sets the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment now is due on or before September 12, 2017; Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before October 16, 2017; Defendant's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before November 9, 2017; and Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before December 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/10/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-10Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 9/12/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/16/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/9/2017. Plaintiff's Cross Motion due by 10/16/2017. Response to Cross Motion due by 11/9/2017. Reply to Cross Motion due by 12/5/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-09-0715STIPULATION of Dismissal by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff