Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00532
Date Filed2017-03-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission for records concerning a 2013 sniper attack at the Metcalf Substation in California. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-231COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4886580) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons FERC)(Rothstein, David) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
2017-03-232LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Rothstein, David) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
2017-03-23Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (sth) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-03-243SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-04-074RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/3/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/3/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/3/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION served on 4/3/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Rothstein, David) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff