Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00533
Date Filed2017-03-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning any work-related communications sent by using the app Signal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-231COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4886655) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons EPA)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
2017-03-232LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
2017-03-23Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (jd) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-03-243SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-04-034RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/31/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/30/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/31/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 3/30/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-05-015ANSWER to Complaint by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-02MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule by May 16, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/2/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule by 5/16/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-166NOTICE of the Parties' Proposed Briefing Schedule by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-05-16MINUTE ORDER: As jointly proposed by the parties, the Court ORDERS that: (1) Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by July 7, 2017; (2) Plaintiff shall file its opposition to Defendant's summary-judgment motion and its cross-motion for summary judgment by August 7, 2017; (3) Defendant shall file its reply in support of its summary-judgment motion and its opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment by September 6, 2017; and (4) Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment by September 20, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/16/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-05-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 7/7/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/7/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/6/2017. Replies due by 9/20/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-07-067Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-06MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that: (1) Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by July 21, 2017; (2) Plaintiff shall file its opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment by August 21, 2017; (3) Defendant shall file its reply in support of its summary-judgment motion and opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion by September 20, 2017; and (4) Plaintiff shall file its reply by October 4, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/6/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 7/21/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/21/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/20/2017. Replies due by 10/4/2017. (znbn) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff