Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00541
Date Filed2017-03-24
Date Closed2017-04-24
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for records of communications between agency scientist Thomas Karl and John Holdren, executive director of the Office of Science and Technology Policy between 2009 and 2017. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-241COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4888493) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Department of Commerce)(Fedeli, Chris) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/27/2017) (jd). Modified on 3/27/2017 to correct filing error, summons were filed in place of complaint (jd). (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-03-242LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-03-24Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (sth) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-03-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-04-034RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/31/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/30/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/30/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 3/30/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-075GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 7, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-206NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-04-247NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-24MINUTE ORDER. In light of the plaintiff's 7 Notice of Dismissal, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 24, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff