Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00542
Date Filed2017-03-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-241COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4888514) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons EPA)(Fedeli, Chris) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/27/2017) (jd). Modified on 3/27/2017 to correct filing error, summons were filed in place of complaint (jd). (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-03-242LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-03-24Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (sth) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-03-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-04-034RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/31/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/30/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/31/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 3/30/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-045NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of All Defendants (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff