Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCATHOLIC CHARITIES OF WASHINGTON v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00555
Date Filed2017-03-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffCATHOLIC CHARITIES
Case DescriptionCatholic Charities of Washington submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning why the agency had not updated its website to provide newer policy information about dealing with asylum requests for individuals who had suffered genital mutilation. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Catholic Charities of Washington filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY Office of the General Counsel
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-281COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4890717) filed by CATHOLIC CHARITIES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-03-28Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (md) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-03-292SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-03-303RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/30/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/29/2017. (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-04-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 4/3/2017 (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-04-065RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/03/17. (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-04-116NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-277Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-04-28MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its Response/Reply to the Complaint on or before May 31, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/28/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-04-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/31/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-05-308Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-05-30MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its Response/Reply to the Complaint on or before June 28, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/30/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-05-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/28/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-06-269Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-27MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its Response/Reply to the Complaint on or before July 28, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/27/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/28/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-07-2810ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-31MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule by August 14, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/31/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-07-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 8/14/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-08-0411Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-04MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' joint request, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a joint status report and proposed schedule on or before September 18, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/4/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/18/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-09-1812STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-19MINUTE ORDER: The Court adopts Defendant's 12 Status Report and ORDERS that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before October 18, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/19/17. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/18/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff