Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFRIENDS OF ANIMALS et al v. ROSS et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00569
Date Filed2017-03-29
Date Closed2017-04-28
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffFRIENDS OF ANIMALS
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case DescriptionFriends of Animals and Wildearth Guardians submitted a FOIA request to the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for records concerning the agency's decision that the Queen conch should not be protected under the Endangered Species Act. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and made several interim responses. However, after the agency failed to respond further, Friends of Animals and Wildearth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantWILBUR ROSS in his official capacity as the Secretary of Commerce
DefendantNATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-291COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4893160) filed by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Notice to Counsel/Party Related Case, # 3 Summons as Executed to Wilbur Ross, # 4 Summons as Executed to NOAA, # 5 Summons as Executed to the US Attorney, # 6 Summons as Executed to the Attorney General)(Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-03-292NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS. Case related to Case No. 16-1540-RC. (sb) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-03-29Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (sb) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-03-293SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, WILBUR ROSS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-04-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/10/17. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt as Executed to the US AG)(Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION served on 4/7/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt and Tracking as Executed for NOAA)(Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WILBUR ROSS served on 4/11/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt as Executed to Ross)(Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-187RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/10/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/10/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt as Executed to the USA)(Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-208NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-04-269NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Harris, Michael) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff