Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJabar v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security Transportation Security Administration
DistrictWestern District of New York
CityBuffalo
Case Number1:2017cv00276
Date Filed2017-03-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHon. Lawrence J. Vilardo
PlaintiffSteve S. Jabar
Case DescriptionSteve Jabar submitted a FOIA request to the Transportation Security Administration for records about himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Jabar filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security Transportation Security Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-291COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Homeland Security Transportation Security Administration, filed by Steve S. Jabar.(KM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/31/2017: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KM). (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-03-29Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number BUF054758 (KM) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-03-31Plaintiff mailed the Consent forms and Privacy notice. (KM) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-04-122NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Cerrone on behalf of U.S. Department of Homeland Security Transportation Security Administration (Cerrone, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-183CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steve S. Jabar. (KM) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-05-114ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. Department of Homeland Security Transportation Security Administration.(Cerrone, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-12AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. Please note this entry was inadvertently not docketed at time of case opening. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution (KM) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-07-055MOTION for a Vaughn Index by Steve S. Jabar. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(KM) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-316DECLARATION filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security Transportation Security Administration . (Cerrone, Michael) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-11-177TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Leslie G. Foschio, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 11/17/2017. (CMD) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-208ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2018 11:30 AM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 11/20/2017. (SDW)(Copy of Order mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2018-01-039Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio: Scheduling Conference held on 1/3/2018. Case management order discussed, same to be filed by the court. Pltf shall file, with consent of Deft, motion to opt out of ADR not later than 1/26/2018. Appearances: Pltf: Michael Kuzma, Esq., Steve Jabar; Dft-AUSA Michael Cerrone, Esq. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (SDW) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-0410SCHEDULING ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) ( Defendant shall file its Vaughn index on or before 8/21/2018. Defendant shall release to plaintiff non-exempt documents responsive to plaintiffs Freedom of Information Act (FOIA) request on or before 8/31/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 9/28/2018. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 1/4/2018. (SDW)(Copy of Scheduling Order mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff