Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCurrier v. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2017cv01799
Date Filed2017-03-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley
PlaintiffCora Currier
Case DescriptionCora Currier, a reporter, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security, the Department of State, and the Department of Justice for records concerning the two travel ban executive orders issued by President Donald Trump. Currier also requested expedited processing. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Currier filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantDepartment of State
DefendantDepartment of Justice
DefendantDepartment of Defense
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-03-311COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11279648.). Filed byCora Currier. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 3/31/2017) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-03-312Certificate of Interested Entities by Cora Currier (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 3/31/2017) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-03-313Proposed Summons. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 3/31/2017) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-03-314Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/14/2017. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-03-315Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2017. Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-036Summons Issued as to US Attorney.(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-067CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cora Currier.. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 4/6/2017) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-04-128CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cora Currier (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 4/12/2017) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-05-059NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Berns (Berns, Matthew) (Filed on 5/5/2017) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-0510CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State.. (Berns, Matthew) (Filed on 5/5/2017) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-0511CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cora Currier (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 5/5/2017) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-0512STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Pleading, ADR, and Initial Case Management Conference Deadlines filed by Cora Currier. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 5/5/2017) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-0813ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 12 Stipulation to Extend Pleading, ADR, and Initial Case Management Conference Deadlines. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-08Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/10/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 8/17/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-1914FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against Department of Defense, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State. Filed by Cora Currier. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Department of Defense)(Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 5/19/2017) Modified on 5/23/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-2315Summons Issued as to Department of Defense. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
2017-06-0116CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Supplemental) by Cora Currier (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 6/1/2017) Modified on 6/2/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-2617ANSWER to 14 First Amended Complaint; by Department of Defense, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State. (Berns, Matthew) (Filed on 6/26/2017) Modified on 6/27/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-2618JOINDER & CONSENT re 10 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Department of Defense. (Berns, Matthew) (Filed on 6/26/2017) Modified on 6/27/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-07-2019NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra K. Albert (Albert, Kendra) (Filed on 7/20/2017) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-2020MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Cora Currier. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 8/3/2017. Replies due by 8/10/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Marcia Hofmann, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Proposed Order)(Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 7/20/2017) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-2121STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Modifying Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Continuing ADR Deadlines and Case Management Conference filed by Department of Defense, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State. (Berns, Matthew) (Filed on 7/21/2017) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-2422ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 21 Stipulation Modifying Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Continuing ADR Deadlines and Case Management Conference. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-24Set/Reset Deadlines as to 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 8/10/2017. Replies due by 8/17/2017. Motion Hearing reset for 9/7/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-24Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/5/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-3123MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing Motion for Preliminary Injunction to August 24, 2017 filed by Cora Currier. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Marcia Hofmann, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 7/31/2017) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-08-0224ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 23 Motion to Shorten Time. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-02Set/Reset Deadlines as to 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing reset for 8/24/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-1025OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byDepartment of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit A - Chart of Pending FOIA Litigation, # 3 Exhibit B - DHS-OIG Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C - DOJ-FBI Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D - DOJ-EOUSA Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E - DOJ-OIP Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F - DOJ-OLC Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G - DOS Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H - DOD Declaration, # 10 Exhibit I - DHS-PRIV Declaration, # 11 Exhibit J - DHS-CBP Declaration)(Berns, Matthew) (Filed on 8/10/2017) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-1126NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Kendra K. Albert (Albert, Kendra) (Filed on 8/11/2017) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-1727REPLY (re 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byCora Currier. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental of Marcia Hofmann, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 8/17/2017) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-1828NOTICE of Appearance by Kari E D'Ottavio (D'Ottavio, Kari) (Filed on 8/18/2017) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
2017-08-2429Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held on 8/24/2017 re 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Cora Currier. The parties shall meet and confer re: defendant's rolling production of documents. A status conference is set for 9/7/2017 at 2:00 p.m. and the parties shall file a joint status report by 9/6/2017. (FTR Time 8:59-9:11.) Attorney for Plaintiff: Marcia Hofmann. Attorneys for Defendants: Kari D'Ottario; Matthew Berns. This is a text-only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/24/2017) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-24Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 9/6/2017. Status Conference set for 9/7/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-09-0630STATUS REPORT Joint by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, United States Department of Homeland Security. (D'Ottavio, Kari) (Filed on 9/6/2017) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-0731Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Status Conference held on 9/7/2017. Production of documents are ongoing. The case management conference set for 10/5/2017 is vacated. Joint Status Report due by 9/27/2017. Status Conference set for 9/28/2017 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel may appear by telephone and shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements to appear by telephone. (FTR Time 2:26-2:36.) Attorney for Plaintiff: Marcia Hofmann. Attorney for Defendants: Matthew Berns. This is a text-only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/7/2017) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff