Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00596
Date Filed2017-04-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning plans for retention of emails of former employees after they departed from the agency. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-031COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4899451) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons IRS)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-032LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-03Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (md) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-04-063SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-04-174RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/12/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/12/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/12/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 4/14/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-05-075NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Eileen Hoffman-Logsdon on behalf of INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Hoffman-Logsdon, Megan) (Entered: 05/07/2017)
2017-05-106NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-12MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 12, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff