Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00599
Date Filed2017-04-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning whether Attorney General Jeff Sessions should recuse himself from investigations of the Trump campaign. CREW also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. OIP acknowledged receipt of the request and granted CREW's request for expedited processing. However, OIP indicated that CREW's request was being put in the complex track for processing. After the agency failed to respond further, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-041COMPLAINT Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4900110) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons Department of Justice, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-04-042Corporate Disclosure Statement by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-04-04Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (sb) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-04-043SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-04-244RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/17/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/17/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/17/2017.) (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-245RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/17/2017. (See Docket Entry 4 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-05-016NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-177NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Celia Davis on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-178ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-179ORDER: Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before June 2, 2017. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Amit P. Mehta on 05/17/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-17Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/2/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-06-0110MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, B, C, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-01MINUTE ORDER: On June 1, 2016, Plaintiff filed a 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Pursuant to Local Rule 65.1, Defendant's Opposition is due on or before June 8, 2017. See LCvR 65.1(c). Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed on or before June 14, 2017. The court will hold a hearing on the application for preliminary injunction on June 19, 2017, at 11:00 a.m., in Courtroom 10. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/01/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-01Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's response due by 6/8/2017. Plaintiff's reply due by 6/14/2017. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 6/19/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (cdw) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-0211Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-0812Memorandum in opposition to re 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brinkmann Decl., # 2 Exhibit Order, 03-2078, # 3 Exhibit Order, 00-1396, # 4 Exhibit Order, 06-0096, # 5 Exhibit Order, 06-1773, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-06-12NOTICE OF COURTROOM CHANGE: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 6/19/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Please note the corrected courtroom number. (cdw) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-1413REPLY to opposition to motion re 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, 2)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-1914NOTICE of Filing by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON re 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-19Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 6/19/2017. Motion 10 for Preliminary Injunction, heard and held in abeyance. The parties are directed to meet and confer, and submit a status report by 4:00 PM on June 21, 2017. Preliminary Injunction Hearing tentatively continued to June 22, 2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (cdw) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-2115Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-21MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, the court denies as moot Plaintiff's 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and vacates the hearing scheduled on that Motion. Within one week of Defendant's July 7, 2017, production the parties shall file a Joint Status Report advising the court of any remaining issues and, if appropriate, proposing a briefing schedule to resolve those issues. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/21/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-07-0316TRANSCRIPT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on June 19, 2017; Page Numbers: 1-25. Date of Issuance: July 3, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/1/2017.(wz) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-1317Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-1418ORDER entering the briefing schedule proposed in the parties' 17 Joint Status Report. The schedule for further proceedings in this matter is as follows: (1) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before August 8, 2017; (2) Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion and any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before August 25, 2017; (3) Defendant's Reply in Support of Summary Judgment and Opposition to any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before September 18, 2017; and (4) Plaintiff's Reply in Support of any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before September 27, 2017. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/14/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-14Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 8/8/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/25/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/18/2017. Plaintiff's Cross Motion due by 8/25/2017. Response to Cross Motion due by 9/18/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 9/27/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-08-0819MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration Vanessa R. Brinkmann, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-2520Memorandum in opposition to re 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-2521Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Statement of Material Facts (Nunc Pro Tunc) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-28MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 21 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Statement of Material Facts (Nunc Pro Tunc). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/28/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-08-2822RESPONSE re 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Statement of Material Facts (Nunc Pro Tunc) and Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-09-1823REPLY to opposition to motion re 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Castellano Decl., # 2 Statement of Facts Response)(Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-19Case directly reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Judge Amit P. Mehta is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff