Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00615
Date Filed2017-04-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning efforts by the agency to contact individuals who either asked for an exemption from the provision in the Affordable Care Act to purchase insurance or paid a penalty. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Judicial Watch also submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning that agency's efforts to contact individuals under the same circumstances. HHS also acknowledged the request. However, after hearing nothing further from either agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-061COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4904671) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons IRS, # 5 Summons HHS)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-04-062LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-04-06Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (md) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-04-073SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-074SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-175RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/17/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/17/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/17/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 4/14/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-216NOTICE of Appearance by Kieran O'Neill Carter on behalf of INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-05-177ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-178ANSWER to Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(Hoffman-Logsdon, Megan) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-06-059STANDING FOIA ORDER. Joint Scheduling Order For Further Proceedings due by 6/23/2017 Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 06/05/17. (mac) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-2310PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Hoffman-Logsdon, Megan) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-23MINUTE ORDER. In view of 10 the parties' proposed briefing schedule, the Court directs the parties to submit a joint status report by no later than August 24, 2017 with a recommendation for further proceedings and, if appropriate, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 23, 2017. (lcegs2) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/24/2017. (mac) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff