Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00633
Date Filed2017-04-10
Date Closed2017-06-06
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Inspector General at the Department of the Interior for records concerning an OIG investigation of alleged ethical violations by a supervisory agent of the Bureau of Land Management in Salt Lake City. After the OIG posted a summary of the investigation on its website, PEER requested a copy of the full report. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-101COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR Office of Inspector General ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4907788) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Department of Interior, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-102LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-12Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (sb) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-124STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set out in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/12/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-05-025CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY . (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-046NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-31MINUTE ORDER: More than a week ago, the parties jointly contacted chambers to inform the Court that they had reached a settlement and would be filing a stipulation of dismissal within a week. As of today's date, the parties have not yet filed this stipulation. Accordingly, on or before June 5, 2017, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file the stipulation of dismissal discussed with chambers or, alternatively, to file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings, including a due date for Defendant's answer to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/31/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-05-31Set/Reset Deadlines: On or before 6/5/2017, the parties are to file the stipulation of dismissal or, alternatively, to file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. (kt) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-06-057STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-05MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Stipulation of Settlement and Dismissal 7 , it is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a). Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/5/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff