Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDoyle et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2017cv02542
Date Filed2017-04-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Katherine Polk Failla
PlaintiffKate Doyle
PlaintiffNational Security Archive
PlaintiffCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington
PlaintiffKnight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University
Case DescriptionKate Doyle, the National Security Archive, Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, and the Knight First Amendment Institute submitted FOIA requests to the Secret Service for records concerning logs of visitors to the White House and Mar-a-Lago. After hearing nothing from the agency, the plaintiffs filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantADR Provider
Executive Office of the President
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-101COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13522466)Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Kate Doyle, Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, National Security Archive.(Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-102FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET - BLANK CIVIL COVER SHEET - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Abdo, Alexander) Modified on 4/11/2017 (kl). (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-103RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kate Doyle.(Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-104RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by National Security Archive.(Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-105RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington.(Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-106RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University.(Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-107REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Kate Doyle, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, National Security Archive. (Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-108NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Alexander Abraham Abdo on behalf of Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. New Address: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, 535 West 116th Street, 314 Low Library, New York, New York, United States 10027, (212) 854-9600. (Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-11***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Alexander Abraham Abdo to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): CIVIL COVER SHEET IS BLANK. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated July 2016. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated July 2016 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet. (kl) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-11CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (kl) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-11Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (kl) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-11Case Designated ECF. (kl) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-119ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (kl) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-1110CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-1711NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/14/2017 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 618, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla, and as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/17/2017) (rjm) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-2012AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 4/18/2017, answer due 5/9/2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University; Kate Doyle; Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington; National Security Archive. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts)(Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-04-2413FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Anne L. Weismann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13577863. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Kate Doyle, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, National Security Archive.(Weismann, Anne) Modified on 4/24/2017 (ma). (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-24>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 13 MOTION for Anne L. Weismann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13577863. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. .. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): MISSING AFFIDAVIT OR DECLARATION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 1.3 AND CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING FROM THE COURT OF APPEALS FOR DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (ma) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-2414FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Anne L. Weismann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Kate Doyle, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, National Security Archive. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Certificate in Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne) Modified on 4/25/2017 (ma). (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-25>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 14 MOTION for Anne L. Weismann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. .. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): MISSING CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING FROM THE COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (ma) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-05-0415AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference and Court's Individual Rules served on U.S. Department of Homeland Security on 4/19/2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Kate Doyle, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, National Security Archive. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-1116NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth J Shapiro on behalf of U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-1117NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Sheive Normand on behalf of U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-1118NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brad P. Rosenberg on behalf of U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-1619MOTION for Anne L. Weismann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Kate Doyle, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, National Security Archive. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Anne L. Weismann, # 2 Exhibit Certificate in Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-05-16>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 19 MOTION for Anne L. Weismann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-05-1720ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 19 Motion for Anne L. Weismann to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/17/2017) (rjm) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-2221ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security.(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
2017-07-0622LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Sarah S. Normand dated 07/06/2017 re: Information Requested by Court in Advance of Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security.(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-1423ORDER: On July 14, 2017, the Court held its Initial Pretrial Conference in this case. For the reasons discussed on the record, the Court hereby imposes the parties' proposed schedule for document production and motions practice: The Secret Service will complete its search for and processing of responsive "records of presidential visitors at Mar-a-Lago," and produce any non-exempt responsive records, by September 8, 2017; Defendant will file its motion for summary judgment by September 29, 2017; Plaintiffs will file their opposition (which may include an affidavit or declaration pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(d)) and any cross-motion for summary judgment by November 13, 2017; Defendant will file its reply and opposition to any cross-motion by December 13, 2017; and Plaintiffs will file a reply in support of any cross-motion by January 12, 2018. ( Cross Motions due by 11/13/2017., Motions due by 9/29/2017., Responses due by 12/13/2017, Replies due by 1/12/2018.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/14/2017) (mro) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-14Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/14/2017. (Court Reporter Rose Prater) (Lopez, Jose) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-08-1624TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 7/14/2017 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
2017-08-1625NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 7/14/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
2017-08-3026FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, . Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Kate Doyle, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, National Security Archive. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-09-0727LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Records to Plaintiffs addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Sarah S. Normand dated 09/07/2017. Document filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security.(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-0828MEMO ENDORSED granting 27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to produce agency records responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request is hereby extended from September 8, 2017, to September 15, 2017, at 12:00 p.m.. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/8/2017) (js) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-1329RESPONSE to Motion re: 26 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, . and joint request for amended briefing schedule . Document filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-09-1430MEMO ENDORSED granting 26 Motion to Amend/Correct 26 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, . ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/14/2017) (js) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 12/4/2017. Motions due by 10/23/2017. Responses due by 1/12/2018 Replies due by 2/2/2018. (js) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-1431FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against U.S. Department of Homeland Security.Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Kate Doyle, Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, National Security Archive. Related document: 1 Complaint,.(Weismann, Anne) Modified on 9/15/2017 (pc). (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-15***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Anne L Weismann to RE-FILE re: Document No. 31 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-1532FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, 31 Amended Complaint, against U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Executive Office of the President.Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Kate Doyle, Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, National Security Archive. Related document: 1 Complaint, 31 Amended Complaint,.(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-2033MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Failing to Comply With the Court's July 14 Order . Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Kate Doyle, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, National Security Archive. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support, # 2 Affidavit of Anne L. Weismann, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-2034LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Anne L. Weismann dated September 20, 2017. Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Kate Doyle, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, National Security Archive.(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-2035RESPONSE to Motion re: 33 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Failing to Comply With the Court's July 14 Order . . Document filed by Executive Office of the President, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-2036MEMO ENDORSED on re: 35 Response to Motion, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Executive Office of the President. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants' response to Plaintiff's motion for an order to show cause is October 4, 2017. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/20/2017) (js) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-09-20Set/Reset Deadlines as to 33 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Failing to Comply With the Court's July 14 Order .. Responses due by 10/4/2017 (js) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-09-2137MEMO ENDORSED terminating 34 Letter Motion for Oral Argument. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' request for oral argument ontheir motion for an order to show cause and shall schedule oral argument if, after receiving Defendants' response, the Court believes oral argument would be of use. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/21/2017) (js) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-09-2938NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Casey Kyung-Se Lee on behalf of Executive Office of the President, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Lee, Casey) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-10-0439MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 33 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Failing to Comply With the Court's July 14 Order . . Document filed by Executive Office of the President, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-0440DECLARATION of Kim E. Campbell in Opposition re: 33 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Failing to Comply With the Court's July 14 Order .. Document filed by Executive Office of the President, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-1141REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 33 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Failing to Comply With the Court's July 14 Order . . Document filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Kate Doyle, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, National Security Archive. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff