Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJabar v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictWestern District of New York
CityBuffalo
Case Number1:2017cv00301
Date Filed2017-04-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHon. Lawrence J. Vilardo
PlaintiffSteve Satar Jabar
Case DescriptionSteve Jabar submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records about himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Jabar filed an administrative appeal. The Office of Information Policy denied his appeal, and Jabar filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-101COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice, filed by Steve Satar Jabar.(KLH) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-102CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS - Civil Cover Sheet regarding 1 Complaint filed by Steve Satar Jabar. (KLH) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-11Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 54899 (KLH) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-11Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-11AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (KLH) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-11Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Justice. (KLH) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-123AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on U. S. Department of Justice on 04/10/2017, filed by Steve Satar Jabar. (Kuzma, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-124NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Cerrone on behalf of U.S. Department of Justice (Cerrone, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-05-115ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. Department of Justice.(Cerrone, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-12ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(NRE) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-07-276First MOTION for Disclosure Vaughn Index by Steve Satar Jabar. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Vaughn Index)(Kuzma, Michael) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-317DECLARATION filed by U.S. Department of Justice . (Cerrone, Michael) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-11-168TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Leslie G. Foschio, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 11/16/2017. (CMD) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-11-209ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2018 11:00 AM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 11/20/2017. (SDW) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2018-01-0310Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio: Scheduling Conference held on 1/3/2018. Case management order discussed, same to be filed by the court. Pltf shall file, with consent of Deft, motion to opt out of ADR not later than 1/26/2018. Appearances: Pltf: Michael Kuzma, Esq., Steve Jabar; Dft-AUSA Michael Cerrone, Esq. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (SDW) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-0411SCHEDULING ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Defendant shall file its Vaughn index on or before 4/16/2019. Defendant shall release to plaintiff non-exempt documents responsive to plaintiffs Freedom of Information Act (FOIA) request on or before 2/16/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 5/16/2019. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 1/4/2018. (SDW) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff