Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleStanski v. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityJacksonville
Case Number3:2017cv00422
Date Filed2017-04-11
Date Closed2017-07-18
JudgeSenior Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr
PlaintiffMichael Stanski
Case DescriptionMichael Stanski, a former employee of the Secret Service who served as an agent in Miami, submitted a FOIA request to the agency for emails to and from three employees. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Stanski also submitted a Privacy Act request to the agency to correct alleged errors in his personnel evaluation. After hearing nothing further from agency pertaining to either his FOIA request or his Privacy Act request, Stanski filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Secret Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-111COMPLAINT/Injunctive Relief sought against Department of Homeland Security, United States Secret Service (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number JAX023691) filed by Michael Stanski. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (no service copies)(TSW) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-132SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Attorney's Office, U.S. Department of Justice. (TSW) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-143NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/14/2017. (MO) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
2017-05-174Consent MOTION to extend time to File Response to Complaint by Department of Homeland Security, United States Secret Service. (Cunningham, Collette) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-195ENDORSED ORDER granting 4 Unopposed Motion to extend time to respond to the Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including 6/17/2017 to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 5/19/2017. (MEH) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-06-166Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Department of Homeland Security, United States Secret Service. (Cunningham, Collette) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-07-177NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Michael Stanski (Stanski, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-188ORDER dismissing case, with instructions to the Clerk. Signed by Senior Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. on 7/18/2017. (MO) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff