Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Arizona v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictDistrict of Arizona
CityPhoenix Division
Case Number2:2017cv01083
Date Filed2017-04-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Diane J Humetewa
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Arizona
Case DescriptionThe ACLU of Arizona submitted requests to the Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning implementation of President Trump's travel ban. The ACLU of Arizona also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU of Arizona filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Customs and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-121COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14116866 filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona. (Submitted by David Bodney). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-122Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14116866. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-17-01083-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form Instructions)(SLQ) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-123SUMMONS Submitted by American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona. (Bodney, David) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-124Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona. (Bodney, David) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-125ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 4/12/17. (KGM) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-126SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant shall serve an answer or otherwise plead within thirty days after service, unless the Court otherwise directs for good cause shown. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is six months from the date the case is at issue. Failure to file such a motion shall result in dismissal for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff shall serve Defendant with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 4/12/17. (KGM) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-137SUMMONS Submitted by American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona. (Bodney, David) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-138SUMMONS Submitted by American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona. (Bodney, David) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-149Summons Issued as to United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 04/14/2017)
2017-05-0810NOTICE of Appearance by Chetan Patil on behalf of United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-0811NOTICE re: of Motion filed with the JPML to Transfer Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 by United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security . (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Transfer Motion, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Supporting Memorandum, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Schedule of Actions)(Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-0812Magistrate Election Form Deadline set as to United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
2017-05-0913Order that American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/5/2017 at 04:30 PM before Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: # 1 Instructions, # 2 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
2017-05-1014Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-1015MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Diane J. Humetewa. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-17-1083-PHX-DJH. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for June 5, 2017 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-1116Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint or otherwise respond to Complaint by United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-1117ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint 16 and allowing Defendants up to and including July 10, 2017 to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/11/2017.(LMR) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-1218MOTION to Stay Proceedings pending decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Defendants' Motion to Transfer by United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-05-2619RESPONSE in Opposition re: 18 MOTION to Stay Proceedings pending decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Defendants' Motion to Transfer filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona. (DiGiacomo, Michael) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-06-0120NOTICE re: Notice of Filing Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer to the District of Columbia for Consolidation by American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona . (DiGiacomo, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-0221REPLY to Response to Motion re: 18 MOTION to Stay Proceedings pending decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Defendants' Motion to Transfer filed by United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-0622NOTICE re: Filing of JPML Reply Brief by United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security . (Attachments: # 1 JPML Reply Brief)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-0723NOTICE re: of Order Denying Motion to Stay Proceeding Entered in the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington by American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona . (DiGiacomo, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-1924NOTICE re: Decision in Related Case by United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security . (Attachments: # 1 District of Maine Order)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-2225NOTICE re: Recent Decisions by United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security . (Attachments: # 1 Central District of California Opinion, # 2 District of Oregon Opinion)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-06-2626NOTICE re: Decisions in Related Cases by United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security . (Attachments: # 1 Eastern District of Virginia Order)(Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-2627NOTICE re: of Orders Denying Motions to Stay Proceedings by American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(DiGiacomo, Michael) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-2728NOTICE of Errata re: 27 Notice (Other) by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona.. (DiGiacomo, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-2829NOTICE re: Decision in Related Case by United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security . (Attachments: # 1 Northern District of Illinois Order)(Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-06-2930NOTICE re: Decision in Related Case by United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security . (Attachments: # 1 Southern District of Florida Order)(Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-07-0331NOTICE re: Decision in Related Case by United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security . (Attachments: # 1 Northern District of Georgia Order)(Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-1032ANSWER to 1 Complaint by United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security.(Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff