Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Southern California et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2017cv02778
Date Filed2017-04-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Robert H. Whaley
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Southern California
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Nevada
Case DescriptionThe ACLU of Southern California and the ACLU of Nevada submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning local implementation of President Trump's travel ban. The ACLU of Southern California and the ACLU of Nevada also requested a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU of Southern California and the ACLU of Nevada filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-121COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19672354 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California, American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada. (Attorney Thomas Rohlfs Burke added to party American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas Rohlfs Burke added to party American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California(pty:pla))(Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-122CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California. (Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-123Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California. (Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-124Notice of Party with Pecuinary Interest and Corporate Disclosure Statement NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California, (Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-125APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amy M. Rose to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-1967 4974) filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order re Pro Hac Vice) (Attorney Brendan Nathaniel Charney added to party American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada(pty:pla), Attorney Brendan Nathaniel Charney added to party American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California(pty:pla)) (Charney, Brendan) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-126NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Beverly Reid OConnell and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-127NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-13830 DAY Summons issued re Complaint 1 as to defendants U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (esa) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-199STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES upon filing of the complaint by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (rfi) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-2110ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting 5 Non-Resident Attorney Amy Rose APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California, designating Brendan N Charney as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-2511PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California, re Summons Request 3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 Notice of Filing Proofs of Service of Summons and Complaint on U.S. Attorney for Central District of California served on April 13, 2017. (Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-05-0312PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California, re Summons Request 3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 Notice of Filing Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint served on April 13, 2017 and April 24, 2017. (Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-0813NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Chetan A Patil on behalf of Defendants U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Attorney Chetan A Patil added to party U.S. Customs and Border Protection(pty:dft), Attorney Chetan A Patil added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft))(Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-0814NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew Berns on behalf of Defendants U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Attorney Matthew Berns added to party U.S. Customs and Border Protection(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Berns added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft))(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-0815NOTICE of Motion filed with the JPML to Transfer Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed by Defendants U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Transfer Motion, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Supporting Memorandum, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Schedule of Actions)(Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-1016EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 6/29/2017 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendants U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-1217ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: Upon consideration of Defendants' Unopposed Ex Parte Application, and for good cause showing, the Court ORDERS that Defendants' time to respond to the Complaint is extended to June 29, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. 16 (rfi) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-05-1718NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Defendants' Motion to Transfer filed by Defendants U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Motion set for hearing on 6/26/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-3119NOTICE of Filing Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer to District of Columbia for Consolidation filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Plaintiffs, 42 American Civil Liberties Union Affiliates, In Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Transfer to District of Columbia for Consolidation)(Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-06-0520Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Defendants' Motion to Transfer 18 Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California. (Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-0621NOTICE Filing of JPML Reply Brief filed by Defendants U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 JPML Reply Brief)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-0622NOTICE of Errata filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California. Notice of Errata Concerning Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Stay Proceedings (Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-0723NOTICE of Decision: Order Denying Motion to Stay Proceeding filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California. Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority (Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-1224REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Defendants' Motion to Transfer 18 filed by Defendants U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-1925NOTICE of Decision: Motion to Stay in Related Case filed by Defendants U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 District of Maine Order)(Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-2126NOTICE of Decision: Order Denying Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California. Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority (Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-2127MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING DECISION ON MOTION TO TRANSFER 18 The Court GRANTS Defendants Motion. The Court hereby STAYS this Action for sixty (60) days. The parties shall submit a joint report to apprise the Court of this matters status upon either (1) the JPMLs ruling on the Transfer Motion, or (2) the expiration of the 60-day stay, whichever comes first. The hearingscheduled for June 26, 2017 is hereby VACATED.IT IS SO ORDERED. (rfi) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-08-0328ORDER DENYING TRANSFER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2786, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the motion for centralization of these actions is denied. (jp) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-1729Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mohammad K Tajsar counsel for Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California. Adding Mohammad Tajsar as counsel of record for Plaintiffs American Civl Liberties Union of Southern California, et al. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California, et al.. (Attorney Mohammad K Tajsar added to party American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada(pty:pla), Attorney Mohammad K Tajsar added to party American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California(pty:pla))(Tajsar, Mohammad) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-1730Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mitra Ebadolahi counsel for Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California. Mitra Ebadolahi is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California; American Civil Union of Nevada. (Ebadolahi, Mitra) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-1831NOTICE Joint Report filed by defendants U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
2017-08-2132NOTICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell re: Joint Report 31 The Court ORDERS that the Stay in this action is lifted. Defendant is ORDERED to respond to the Complaint no later than August 29, 2017. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-08-2133NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Danielle Wolfson Young on behalf of Defendants U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Attorney Danielle Wolfson Young added to party U.S. Customs and Border Protection(pty:dft), Attorney Danielle Wolfson Young added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft))(Young, Danielle) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-08-2234Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Berns counsel for Defendants U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Matthew J. Berns is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Customs and Border Protection. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
2017-08-2935ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 .(Young, Danielle) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-08-3036ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Beverly Reid OConnell. This matter is set for a Scheduling Conference on 11/20/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (jp) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-09-1137REQUEST for Leave of Danielle W. Young to Appear for Scheduling Conference by Telephone filed by Defendants U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Young, Danielle) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-1438ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' COUNSEL'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: The Court ORDERS that the request is granted and Danielle W. Young shall be permitted to appear telephonically. 37 (rfi) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-11-0339ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#17-110) approved by Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Pursuant to the directive of the Chief U.S. District Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the following cases are ordered transferred from the calendar of Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell to the calendar of Judge Robert H. Whaley for all further proceedings. Case now reads as 2:17-cv-02778 RHW(ASx). (rn) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-0640TEXT ONLY ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Robert H. Whaley. The Scheduling Conference, set for 11/20/2017, at 1:30 PM, is hereby CONTINUED to 12/1/2017, at 10:00 AM, before Judge Robert H. Whaley, in Courtroom 5B, U.S. Courthouse, 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Counsel shall appear on this new date and time. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-0741TEXT ONLY ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Robert H. Whaley: The Scheduling Conference, set for 12/1/2017, at 10:00 AM, is hereby MOVED in location from Courtroom 5B to Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, U.S. Courthouse, 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Counsel shall appear in Courtroom 6C on 12/1/2017, at 10:00 AM. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
2017-11-1342JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial TBD, filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California.. (Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-1343NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan 42 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): The new case number is now 2:17cv02778-RHW (ASx). Please make sure to include the new judge initials on all future documents. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-1744TEXT ONLY ORDER by Judge Robert H. Whaley. The Scheduling Conference set for 12/1/2017 at 10:00 AM, is hereby CONTINUED BY ONE HOUR to 12/1/2017, at 11:00 AM, before Judge Robert H. Whaley, in Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, U.S. Courthouse, 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Counsel shall appear on this date and new time. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-2045REQUEST for Leave of Defendants' Counsel to Appear for Conference Telephonically U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Young, Danielle) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-2046ORDER by Judge Robert H. Whaley: GRANTING 45 Motion for Leave of Danielle W. Young and Chetan A. Patil as Attorneys to Appear Telphonically for Defendants U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (shb) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-2147REQUEST for Order for Request for Relief from Lead Counsel Requirement filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California. Request set for hearing on 12/1/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Robert H. Whaley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-2948ORDER GRANTING PLAINTFFS' REQUEST FOR RELEF FROM LEAD COUNSEL REQUIREMENT 47 by Judge Robert H. Whaley. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs' request for relief, ECF No. 47, is GRANTED. 2. Associate counsel Brendan N. Charney is permitted to appear on behalf of lead counsel Thomas R. Burke at the scheduling conference on December 1, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. (jre) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-12-0149MINUTES OF IN COURT AND TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference held before Judge Robert H. Whaley. The COURT sets this matter on December 11, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. File any factual affidavits by next Wednesday. File replies by next Friday. The COURT gives counsel preliminary understanding. Court Reporter: Victoria Valine. (shb) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-0450TEXT ONLY ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Robert H. Whaley: The hearing in this action set for 12/11/2017, at 11:00 am, shall take place in Courtroom 5B, 5th Floor, U.S. Courthouse, 350. W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Counsel shall appear at this location for hearing. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-0651TEXT ONLY ORDER by Judge Robert H. Whaley. The continued Scheduling Conference and hearing re discovery, set for 12/11/2017, at 11:00 AM, shall now take place in Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, U.S. Courthouse, 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Counsel shall appear at this new location. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-0652NOTICE of DECLARATION FILING U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Exhibit 1 (Patrick Howard))(Young, Danielle) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-0853DECLARATION of Brendan Charney in Support of Plaintiffs' Request for a Production Order filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Charney, Brendan) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-0854Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Skurnik counsel for Defendants U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Adding Matthew Skurnik as counsel of record for Department of Homeland Security, Customs and Border Protection for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Customs and Border Protection, Department of Homeland Security. (Attorney Matthew Skurnik added to party U.S. Customs and Border Protection(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Skurnik added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft))(Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-0855NOTICE of Errata re Exhibit C to the Declaration of Brendan Charney in Support of Plaintiffs' Request for a Production Order filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California. (Charney, Brendan) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-0856REQUEST for Order for Joint Request to Seal filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California. Request set for hearing on 12/11/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Robert H. Whaley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Charney, Brendan) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-1157MINUTES OF MOTION Hearing 56 held before Judge Robert H. Whaley: COURT addresses counsel and summarizes understanding of case. 1,400 documents. COURT will issue an Order. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (shb) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-1258ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST TO SEAL 56 by Judge Robert H. Whaley. See document for complete details. (jre) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
2017-12-1259DISREGARD PER 60 SEE 61 - ORDER SETTING PRODUCTION SCHEDULE by Judge Robert H. Whaley. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER AND COMPLETE DETAILS. (jre) Modified on 12/13/2017 (jre). (Entered: 12/12/2017)
2017-12-1360NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: Order at 59 . Document at 59 was not served upon the parties by CM/ECF. The clerk will refile the document to ensureproper service upon the parties. Docket entry 59 should be disregarded. (jre) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
2017-12-1361ORDER SETTING PRODUCTION SCHEDULE by Judge Robert H. Whaley. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER AND COMPLETE DETAILS. (jre) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
2017-12-1362Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Chetan A Patil counsel for Defendants U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Chetan A. Patil is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Customs and Border Protection. (Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
2018-03-1463STATUS REPORT (JOINT) filed by Defendants U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-1664ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE by Judge Robert H. Whaley. The Court finds good reason to GRANT this request. In consideration of the statements presented in the stipulation and its own docket, the proceedings will be CONTINUED until May 11, 2018. The parties shall file an updated Joint Status Report on or before this date. (yl) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-05-1165STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California. (Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-1566ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE by Judge Robert H. Whaley. The Court finds good reason to GRANT this request. In consideration of the statements presented in the Joint Status Report and its own docket, the proceedings shall be CONTINUED until July 10, 2018. The parties shall file an updated Joint Status Report on or before this date. (shb) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-07-0967STATUS REPORT (JOINT) filed by Defendants U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-2568ORDER by Judge Robert H. Whaley. The Court finds good reason to GRANT this request. In consideration of the statements presented in the Joint Status Report and its own docket, the proceedings shall be CONTINUED until August 30, 2018. The parties shall file an updated Joint Status Report on or before this date. (shb) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-08-3069STATUS REPORT (JOINT) filed by Defendants U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-09-0770Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Danielle Wolfson Young counsel for Defendants U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Danielle Wolfson Young is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Customs and Border Protection. (Young, Danielle) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-1171ORDER by Judge Robert H. Whaley. The Court finds good reason to GRANT this request. In consideration of the statements presented in the Joint Status Report and its own docket, the proceedings shall be CONTINUED until October 29, 2018. The parties shall file an updated Joint Status Report on or before this date. (shb) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-10-2972STATUS REPORT (JOINT) filed by Defendants U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-11-0573ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE by Judge Robert H. Whaley. The Court finds good reason to GRANT this request. IT IS SO ORDERED: Parties joint request for a continuance, ECF No. 72, is GRANTED. The proceedings shall be CONTINUED until January 11, 2019. The parties shall file an updated Joint Status Report on or before this date. (shb) (Entered: 11/06/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar