Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Florida v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityMiami
Case Number1:2017cv21382
Date Filed2017-04-12
Date Closed2017-06-29
JudgeJudge Darrin P. Gayles
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Florida
Case DescriptionThe ACLU of Florida submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning the local implementation of President Trump's travel ban. The ACLU of Florida also requested a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, the ACLU of Florida filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-121COMPLAINT for declaratory and injunctive relief for violation of the Freedom of Information Act against U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9647763, filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request (Miami), # 2 Exhibit FOIA Request (Tampa), # 3 Exhibit U.S. Postal Service Priority Tracking, # 4 Exhibit Tracking Results (Miamil), # 5 Exhibit Tracking Results (Tampa), # 6 Exhibit Tracking Results (Headquarters), # 7 Exhibit Acknowledgement (Miami), # 8 Exhibit Notice (Miami), # 9 Exhibit Acknowledgement (Tampa), # 10 Exhibit Notice (Miami))(Stevenson, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-122Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lrz1) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-133Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lrz1) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-134Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (lrz1) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-135NOTICE by American Civil Liberties Union of Florida re 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case - Civil Coversheet (Stevenson, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-05-086NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chetan A. Patil on behalf of U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Attorney Chetan A. Patil added to party U.S. Customs and Border Protection(pty:dft), Attorney Chetan A. Patil added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft). (Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-087NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J. Berns on behalf of U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Attorney Matthew J. Berns added to party U.S. Customs and Border Protection(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J. Berns added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft). (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-088NOTICE by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security of Motion filed with the JPML to Transfer Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Transfer Motion, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Supporting Memorandum, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Schedule of Action) (Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-109NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by American Civil Liberties Union of Florida re 1 Complaint,, filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Florida (Abudu, Nancy) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-1110Summons Issued as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security(asl) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-1211Courtesy Copy of Motion to Transfer of Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings sent before The United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by U.S. Department of HOmeland Security and U.S. Customs and Border Protection (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support, # 2 Schedule of Actions)(gp) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-05-1512NOTICE by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security re 6 Notice of Attorney Appearance, Corrected Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Corrected Certificate of Service) (Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-1513NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amien Kacou on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of Florida. Attorney Amien Kacou added to party American Civil Liberties Union of Florida(pty:pla). (Kacou, Amien) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-2314SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by American Civil Liberties Union of Florida. United States Attorney served on 5/19/2017, answer due 7/18/2017. (Kacou, Amien) Modified text on 5/24/2017 (jas). (Entered: 05/23/2017)
2017-05-2315SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by American Civil Liberties Union of Florida. U.S. Attorney General served on 5/22/2017, answer due 7/21/2017. (Kacou, Amien) Modified text on 5/24/2017 (jas). (Entered: 05/23/2017)
2017-05-2516SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by American Civil Liberties Union of Florida. U.S. Customs and Border Protection served on 5/25/2017, answer due 7/24/2017; U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 5/25/2017, answer due 7/24/2017. (Kacou, Amien) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-2617Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 1 Complaint,, by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-2618ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to 15 Summons Returned Executed as to USA Attorney General supplemental receipt filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Florida. (Kacou, Amien) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-3019ENDORSED ORDER granting 17 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Response to Complaint. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before August 3, 2017. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-06-0620NOTICE by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security of Filing of JPML Reply Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit JPML Reply Brief) (Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-0721NOTICE by American Civil Liberties Union of Florida of Filing of JPML Memorandum in Opposition (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit JPML Memorandum in Opposition) (Kacou, Amien) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-2922ENDORSED ORDER STAYING CASE pending a transfer decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. This case is administratively closed, for statistical purposes only, without prejudice to the substantive rights of any of the parties. Any party may move to reopen this case at the appropriate time. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69. (Entered: 06/29/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff