Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc. v. U.S. Customs and Border Protection et al
DistrictSouthern District of Texas
CityHouston
Case Number4:2017cv01128
Date Filed2017-04-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Vanessa D Gilmore
PlaintiffACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe ACLU Foundation of Texas submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning the local implementation of President Trump's travel ban. The ACLU Foundation of Texas also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU Foundation of Texas filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Protection
DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-121COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-18210188) filed by ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Exhibit)(Saldivar, Edgar) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-132ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/1/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(LinhthuDoadi, ) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-203NOTICE of Related Cases by ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc., filed. (Saldivar, Edgar) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-04-264Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Continuation, # 2 Continuation, # 3 Continuation)(Saldivar, Edgar) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-275CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc., filed.(Saldivar, Edgar) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-05-02Summons Issued as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-086NOTICE of motion filed with the United States Judicial Panel on MultiDistrict Litigation to Transfer this Action Pursuant to 28 USC 1407 by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit index of exhibits, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Bobb, Andrew) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-117Letter re: Defendant's Transfer Motion, filed. (agarcia, 7) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-128RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection served on 5/11/2017, answer due 7/10/2017, filed.(Saldivar, Edgar) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-05-129RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 5/11/2017, answer due 7/10/2017, filed.(Saldivar, Edgar) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-05-2510Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/15/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bobb, Andrew) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-2611ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint; Answer due for U.S. Customs and Border Protection 7/27/2017; U.S. Department of Homeland Security 7/27/2017. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-3012NOTICE OF MEMORANDUM OF PLAINTIFFS, 42 AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION AFFILIATES, IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR TRANSFER TO THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA FOR CONSOLIDATION re: 6 Notice (Other), by ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Saldivar, Edgar) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-05-3113COPIES OF DOCUMENTS FILED IN THE MDL CASE, filed.(SandraSilva, 7) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-0214Copies of Documents Filed in the MDL Case, filed.(MonicaBalboa, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2017: # 1 Attachment) (MonicaBalboa, ). (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-0615NOTICE Reply Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion for Transfer of Action Pursuant to 18 USC 1407 by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Transfer of Actions Pursuant to 28 USC 1407)(Bobb, Andrew) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-2316Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/14/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hu, Daniel) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-2617ORDER granting 16 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Defendant's Motion to Transfer. In the event that the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation denies the motion to transfer, Defendants shall file their responsive pleading no later than 14 days after the date of the denial. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-08-0418NOTICE UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION ORDER DENYING TRANSFER by ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc., filed. (Saldivar, Edgar) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-1619ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, filed.(Bobb, Andrew) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
2017-08-1720Agreed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial & Scheduling Conference by ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/7/2017. (Saldivar, Edgar) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-2221NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Powers on behalf of U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, filed. (Powers, James) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
2017-08-2222Memorandum and Order Regarding Discovery Motions, Motions for Summary Judgment and Analogous Motions to Dismiss. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
2017-08-2423ORDER granting 20 Agreed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial & Scheduling Conference. (Scheduling Conference reset for 9/15/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-09-0524JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc., filed.(Saldivar, Edgar) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-09-1325NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Scheduling Conference set for 10/20/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore, filed. (bthomas, 4) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff