Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleALLIANCE FOR WILD ROCKIES v. COUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00654
Date Filed2017-04-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffALLIANCE FOR WILD ROCKIES
Case DescriptionThe Alliance for the Wild Rockies submitted a FOIA request to the Council on Environmental Quality for records concerning correspondence between the agency and the Idaho Panhandle National Forest pertaining to the Tower Fire Salvage and Reforestation Project. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and indicated that it would begin to process it. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Alliance for the Wild Rockies filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCOUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-131COMPLAINT against COUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4913276) filed by ALLIANCE FOR WILD ROCKIES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Attorney General, # 3 Summons for Defendant, # 4 Summons for Civil Process Clerk)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-132MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kristine M. Akland, :Firm- Akland Law Firm, :Address- 317 E. Spruce St., Missoula, MT 59802. Phone No. - (406) 544-9863. Fax No. - (970) 797-9133 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4913389. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALLIANCE FOR WILD ROCKIES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristine M. Akland, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-133MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Timothy M. Bechtold, :Firm- bechtold Law Firm PLLC, :Address- 317 E. Spruce St., Missoula, MT 59802. Phone No. - (406) 721-1435. Fax No. - 406-830-3085 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4913427. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALLIANCE FOR WILD ROCKIES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Timothy M. Bechtold, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-13Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (jd) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-174SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to COUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-05-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/24/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/24/2017. (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-026RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. COUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY served on 4/24/2017 (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-027RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/24/17. (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-038GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 3, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-04MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the plaintiff's motion for the pro hac vice admission of attorney Kristine M. Akland, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Kristine Akland is admitted pro hac vice in this matter for the purpose of representing the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 4, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-04MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the plaintiff's motion for the pro hac vice admission of attorney Timothy M. Bechtold, the Court notes that Mr. Bechtold's declaration failed to indicate whether he has in fact appeared pro hac vice in this Court, and if so, the number of times he has done so in accordance with the Local Rules of this Court. See LCvR 83.2(d). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to afford the plaintiff the opportunity to refile the motion with Mr. Bechtold's declaration, curing the technical oversight. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 4, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-059Second MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Timothy M. Bechtold, :Firm- Bechtold Law Firm PLLC, :Address- 317 E. Spruce St., Missoula, MT 59802. Phone No. - (406) 721-1435. Fax No. - (970 797-9133 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4942180. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALLIANCE FOR WILD ROCKIES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Timothy M. Bechtold, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-08MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Upon consideration of the plaintiff's motion for the pro hac vice admission of attorney Timothy M. Bechtold, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Timothy Bechtold is admitted pro hac vice in this matter for the purpose of representing the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 8, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-1910NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of COUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-2211MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or otherwise respond by COUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
2017-05-23MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiff's Complaint on or before June 23, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 23, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
2017-05-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Answer to the Complaint due by 6/23/2017, (hs) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
2017-06-2312NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ALLIANCE FOR WILD ROCKIES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Sun)(Akland, Kristine) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-07-0713MOTION for Attorney Fees by ALLIANCE FOR WILD ROCKIES (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion for Fees, # 2 Declaration Dec of Michael Garrity, # 3 Declaration Dec of Matt Kenna, # 4 Declaration Dec of David Bahr, # 5 Declaration Dec of Tim Bechtold, # 6 Declaration Dec of Kristine Akland, # 7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Akland, Kristine) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-1914Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION for Attorney Fees by COUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-20MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Upon consideration of the defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiff's motion on or before August 21, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 20, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response due by 8/21/2017 (hs) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-08-1115Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by COUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-14MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Upon consideration of the defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees on or before September 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 14, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response to Motion of attorneys' fees due by 9/20/2017 (hs) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff