Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleStevens v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2017cv02853
Date Filed2017-04-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer
PlaintiffJacqueline Stevens
Case DescriptionJacqueline Stevens, a professor of political science at Northwestern University, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning correspondence on detention or removal proceedings for people claiming or proving U.S. citizenship since January 2017. Although the agency did not provide an acknowledgement of receipt of Stevens' request, it did send her an email indicating that it was experiencing a backlog. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Stevens filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-141COMPLAINT filed by Jacqueline Stevens; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13074856. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1 - FOIA Request)(Free, Robert) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
2017-04-14CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (meg, ) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-182ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jacqueline Stevens by Robert Andrew Free (Free, Robert) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-183LR 83.15(a) Designation of Local Counsel by Jacqueline Stevens (Free, Robert) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-18SUMMONS Issued as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (pg, ) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-184MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 6/19/2017 at 09:00 AM, courtroom 2141. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-285ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jacqueline Stevens by Daniel Warren Thomann (Thomann, Daniel) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-04-286SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacqueline Stevens as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney's Office, U.S. Attorney General served on 4/24/2017, answer due 6/26/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Summons Returned Executed as to DHS-OGC, # 2 Exhibit Summons Returned Executed as to USAG, # 3 Exhibit Delivery Confirmation, # 4 Exhibit Proof of Costs) (Free, Robert) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 4/28/2017 (jh, ). (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-05-247DESIGNATION of Prashant Kolluri as U.S. Attorney for Defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Kolluri, Prashant) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-248ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(Kolluri, Prashant) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-269MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 6/19/2017 is stricken. The parties are directed to appear through lead counsel for a pretrial conference pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 16. on 6/19/2017 at 9:00 AM. Counsel are requested promptly to meet face-to-face for a discussion of possible settlement and for preparation of a planning report. The form is accessible from the court's Internet site, www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Such report shall be submitted to Judge Pallmeyer in chambers no later than two business days prior to the conference. Mailed notice (etv, ) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-06-1310MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: By agreement, Rule 16 conference set for 6/19/2017 is stricken and re-set to 6/30/2017 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-2911MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: By agreement, Rule 16 conference set for 6/30/2017 is stricken and re-set to 7/5/2017 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-07-0412REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jacqueline Stevens (Free, Robert) (Entered: 07/04/2017)
2017-07-0513MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Rule 16 conference held on 7/5/2017. Status hearing set for 8/30/2017 at 9:00 a.m., Attorney Free will be allowed to appear by telephone. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff