Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00671
Date Filed2017-04-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning payments made to Christopher Steele. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and placed the Cause of Action Institute in the news media fee category. After hearing nothing more from the agency, Cause of Action Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-171COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4916285) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons FBI, # 6 Summons AG, # 7 Summons Clerk)(Vecchione, John) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-172Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Vecchione, John) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/18/2017) (jf). (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-173NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-174NOTICE of Appearance by Russel James Valvo, III on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-17Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (sth) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-185SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-246RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 4/24/2017 (Vecchione, John) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-247RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/24/2017. (Vecchione, John) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-248RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/24/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/24/2017. (Vecchione, John) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-05-049NOTICE of Appearance by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-2410NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by James O. Bickford on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION Substituting for attorney Wyneva Johnson (Bickford, James) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-2411ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Bickford, James) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-24MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 6/7/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 05/24/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-06-0712Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-09MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the schedule proposed by the parties in their 12 Joint Status Report is ADOPTED, that the FBI shall produce all non-exempt records responsive to Cause of ActionInstitutes FOIA request, if any, or otherwise respond to the request on or before 6/21/2017, and that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary on or before 7/7/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/09/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-06-2313GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/23/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-07-0714Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-11Based on the representations in the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties' proposed schedule is ADOPTED and that the following deadlines are set for briefing summary judgment in this matter: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before 9/1/2017; Plaintiff's Consolidated Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before 9/22/2017; Defendant's Consolidated Reply and Opposition is due on or before 10/13/2017; Plaintiff's Reply is due on or before 10/27/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/11/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff