Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00718
Date Filed2017-04-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the FBI and the National Security Division of the Justice Department for records concerning any applications for FISA warrants to surveil Trump Tower or anyone connected with the Trump campaign. American Oversight also requested expedited processing. Both agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. The National Security Division denied American Oversight's request for expedited processing and told the organization that it could neither confirm nor deny the existence of records without revealing classified information. American Oversight filed an administrative appeal of NSD's decision with the Office of Information Policy. OIP upheld NSD's response. After hearing nothing further from the FBI, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-191COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4919270) filed by American Oversight. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B - NSD Response, # 3 Exhibit C - Administrative Appeal, # 4 Exhibit D - Appeal Response, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-192Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Oversight. (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-203REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-04-21Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (sb) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-214SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/25/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/25/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Receipt for Certified Mail - U.S. Attorney, # 2 Exhibit B - Receipt for Certified Mail - U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit C - Receipt for Certified Mail - Department of Justice, # 4 Exhibit D - Receipt for Certified Mail - Federal Bureau of Investigation)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/25/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 4/25/2017; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/25/2017. (See Docket Entry 5 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-05-037NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E. Powell on behalf of All Defendants (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-258ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Powell, Amy) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-07-069ORDER: The Government is to produce a Vaughn Index with a supporting Motion to Dismiss, or Motion for Summary Judgment within 30 days. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/6/17. (nbn) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-1210Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-08-0811ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Summary Judgment motions due by 9/1/2017. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/7/17. (lsj) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff