Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00727
Date Filed2017-04-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning communications between White House Chief of Staff Reince Priebus or anyone acting on his behalf and the FBI pertaining to its investigation of possible connections between the Trump campaign and Russia. American Oversight also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. American Oversight also submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the background check for Attorney General Jeff Sessions to obtain a security clearance. American Oversight also requested expedited processing for its request pertaining to Attorney General Sessions. After hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-191COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4919353) filed by American Oversight. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Priebus FOIA, # 2 Exhibit B - Sessions FOIA, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-192Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Oversight. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-19Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (sth) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-193STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/19/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-194ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) Modified on 4/21/2017 (sth). (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-215REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-216SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-257RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/25/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/25/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Receipt for Certified Mail - U.S. Attorney, # 2 Exhibit B - Receipt for Certified Mail - U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit C - Receipt for Certified Mail - Department of Justice, # 4 Exhibit D - Receipt for Certified Mail - Federal Bureau of Investigation)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-05-248ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Motgi, Anjali) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-24MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on June 12, 2017, at 2:15 p.m., to discuss the schedule for further proceedings in this matter. The parties shall confer in advance of the status conference to narrow the issues for discussion. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/24/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-24Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 6/12/2017 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (dot) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-06-099NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Togman Sloan on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Sloan, Melanie) (Main Document 9 replaced on 6/9/2017) (jf). (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-06-12Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 6/12/2017. Counts one (1) and four (4) of the complaint are now moot and therefore dismissed. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-12MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' representations at today's status conference, the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: With respect to the "Sessions" FOIA request, Dkt. 1 -2, Defendants shall produce any responsive documents that are not subject to a FOIA exception or exemption on or before July 12, 2017. With respect to the "Pribeus" FOIA request, Dkt. 1 -1, Defendants shall complete their searches for any responsive documents, absent a showing of good cause, on or before July 12, 2017. To the extent practicable, Defendants shall also begin the consultation and review processes for responsive documents identified prior to the July 12 deadline. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties appear for a status conference on July 13, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/12/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-13Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants to produce any responsive documents that are not subject to a FOIA exception or exemption on or before 7/12/2017; With respect to the "Pribeus" FOIA request, Defendants to complete their searches for any responsive documents, on or before 7/13/2017. Status Conference set for 7/13/2017, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-07-1210NOTICE of Production by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-1311NOTICE of Filing by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Motgi, Anjali) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff