Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. US DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00729
Date Filed2017-04-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted FOIA requests to the Department of State and the U.S. Agency for International Development for records concerning funds paid to the Foundation Open Society Macedonia and any contacts or correspondence with the organization. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from either agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantU.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-191COMPLAINT against US DEPARTMENT OF STATE ET AL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4919594) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons DOS, # 5 Summons USAID)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-192LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-213SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-274NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of All Defendants (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-04-275RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/25/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/25/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/25/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 4/25/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-05-256ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-25MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule by June 9, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/25/2017. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 6/9/2017 (hs) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-06-087Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-06-08MINUTE ORDER adopting 7 the parties' joint proposal: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report every 60 days informing the court of the status of this case and, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/8/2017. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-08-078Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff