Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00741
Date Filed2017-04-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records concerning the use of a personal email account by former Secretary of Defense Ash Carter. Cause of Action Institute also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, granted Cause of Action Institute's request for expedited processing, and told Cause of Action Institute that the agency had already processed and posted Carter's emails online. Cause of Action Institute filed an administrative appeal, arguing that the publicly posted emails did not respond to all parts of its request. DOD agreed, and remanded the request for further search. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Cause of Action Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-211COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4923030) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons DOD, # 11 Summons AG, # 12 Summons Clerk)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-212Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-213NOTICE of Appearance by Russel James Valvo, III on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-214NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-21Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (sth) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-215SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-05-036NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-107RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 5/9/2017 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-108RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/2/2017. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-109ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/1/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/31/2017. (Mulvey, Ryan) Modified on 5/10/2017 (md). (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-10NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 9 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, was entered in error at the request of counsel and counsel will refile said pleading. (md) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-1010RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-1011RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/2/2017. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-1012RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/1/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/31/2017. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff