Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRamdeo v. Pleasant et al
DistrictSouthern District of Mississippi
CityNorthern Jackson
Case Number3:2017cv00293
Date Filed2017-04-21
Date Closed2017-09-14
JudgeDistrict Judge Carlton W. Reeves
PlaintiffSonny Austin Ramdeo
Case DescriptionSonny Austin Ramdeo, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons for his transfer form. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after Ramdeo filed several complaints concerning the agency's failure to respond, he filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantZ. Pleasant Case Manager
DefendantS. Hinton Case Manager
DefendantE. K. Carlton Associate Warden
DefendantPro Se Department
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-211VERIFIFED COMPLAINT against E. K. Carlton, S. Hinton, Z. Pleasant, filed by Sonny Austin Ramdeo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Cover Letter, # 7 Envelope, # 8 Notice of Assignment)(KNS). (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-212*RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Sonny Austin Ramdeo (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(KNS) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-213REQUEST TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Sonny Austin Ramdeo (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(KNS) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/21/2017) (KNS). (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-244ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 5/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 4/24/2017. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-05-015Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138. Acknowledgement filed by Sonny Austin Ramdeo. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(RRL) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-036Change of Address filed by Sonny Austin Ramdeo. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope).(RRL) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-07-057ORDER: The plaintiff shall file within 30 days of the date of this order a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/5/2017. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-08-218ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, pro se Plaintiff Sonny Austin Ramdeo shall either pay the required filing fee; amend his application to proceed in forma pauperis, or file a written response showing cause why this case should not be dism issed for failure to obey an Order of the Court 7 . Show Cause Response due by 9/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 8/21/2017. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-09-059MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal by Sonny Austin Ramdeo.(TLC) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-09-1410ORDER granting 9 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 9/14/17. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (RRL) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-1411FINAL JUDGMENT dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 9/14/17. (RRL) (copy mailed to plaintiff) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff