Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWESTERN VALUES PROJECT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00757
Date Filed2017-04-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffWESTERN VALUES PROJECT
Case DescriptionWestern Values Project submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning former agency employee David Bernhardt. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but aside from an indication that one of the requests had been completed, Western Values Project heard nothing further from the agency. Western Values Project then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-251COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4926863) filed by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits to Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 LCvR7.1, # 4 Summons)(Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-252LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT (md) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-25Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (md) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-05-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/2/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/1/2017. (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-05-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/02/2017. (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-05-166RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 5/1/2017 (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-06-017ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-08MINUTE ORDER SETTING DEADLINES: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order not later than 6/30/17. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/8/17. (DJS) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-06-09Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file a joint status report that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order by 6/30/17. (jth) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-06-308Joint STATUS REPORT of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-07-01MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 8 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report by August 30, 2017, along with a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/1/17. (DJS) (Entered: 07/01/2017)
2017-07-02Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file another Joint Status Report along with a proposed order by 8/30/2017. (jth) (Entered: 07/02/2017)
2017-08-309Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-08-31MINTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 9 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint status report by November 1, 2017 and every 60 days thereafter. To the extent the report contains a proposed briefing schedule, the parties shall also submit a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/31/17. (DJS) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-09-04Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file another joint status report by 11/1/2017 and every 60 days thereafter. To the extent the status report contains a proposed briefing schedule, the parties shall also submit a proposed order. (jth) (Entered: 09/04/2017)
2017-11-0110Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff