Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBrooks v. United States Postal Inspection Service
DistrictNorthern District of Ohio
CityCleveland
Case Number1:2017cv00913
Date Filed2017-04-28
Date Closed2017-09-14
JudgeJudge Christopher A. Boyko
PlaintiffJason Brooks
Case DescriptionJason Brooks, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Postal Inspection Service for records concerning himself and how the agency persuaded an individual to consent to the agency's recording of a telephone call. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Brooks filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States Postal Inspection Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-281Complaint against United States Postal Inspection Service. Filing fee not paid. Filed by Jason Brooks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-USPS green card, # 2 Exhibit B-Freedom of Information Act Request) (S,SR) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-01Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (S,SR) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-01Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (S,SR) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-01Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Without the Civil Cover Sheet, the Clerk does not know if this case is related to or is a refiling of a pending/terminated case in this Court. Copy of 1 Complaint and a blank civil cover sheet mailed to Jason Brooks #68174408 at 2240 Hubbard Rd. Youngstown, OH 44505 on 5/1/2017. (S,SR) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-07-172Order directing plaintiff to pay the full filing fee of $400 if funds to pay exist in his prisoner account. If plaintiff does not have funds in the account to pay the entire fee at once, he is ordered to complete and submit the accompanying Financial Application within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 7/17/2017. (Related document 1 ) (Attachments: # 1 Financial Application) (S,S) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-17Copy of 2 Order mailed to at Jason Brooks, #68174408, 2240 Hubbard Rd., Youngstown, OH 44505 on 7/17/2017. (S,S) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-09-143Order of Dismissal. This action is dismissed without prejudice for want of prosecution. The Court further certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 9/14/2017. (H,CM) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-14Copy of 3 Order Dismissing Case, mailed to Jason Brooks, #68174408 at 2240 Hubbard Road, Youngstown, OH 44505 on 9/14/2017. Related document(s) 3 . (H,CM) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff