Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRorrer v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictMiddle District of Pennsylvania
CityWilliamsport
Case Number4:2017cv00751
Date Filed2017-04-27
Date Closed2017-06-13
JudgeHonorable John E. Jones, III
PlaintiffPatricia Rorrer
Case DescriptionPatricia Rorrer, a state prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning DNA analysis conducted between 1994 and 1998 pertaining to the murders of Joann and Alex Katrinak, for which Rorrer had been convicted. The FBI told Rorrer that it had located 1,935 pages of potentially responsive records which could be disclosed on 4 CDS for $55. Rorrer agreed to pay, but by the time the agency had finished processing the records, all but 22 of them were withheld under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Rorrer filed an administrative appeal, which was denied. She then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-271COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation filed by Patricia Rorrer, pro se.(lg) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-04-272MOTION to Compel "Preparation of a Vaughn Index" by Patricia Rorrer, pro se.(lg) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-04-273STANDING PRACTICE ORDER. (Attachments: # 1 285 Service Packet)(lg) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-04-274PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (lg) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-05-02530 DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 05/02/2017. (Attachments: # 1 IFP (Civil Rights), # 2 Authorization Form)(lp) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-06-136ORDER DISMISSING CASE (eo) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff