Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMUSLIM ADVOCATES v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00813
Date Filed2017-05-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffMUSLIM ADVOCATES
Case DescriptionMuslim Advocates submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning border searches conducted of electronic devices from individuals from the seven countries on President Trump's travel ban as well as individuals perceived to be Muslim. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and took a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Muslim Advocates filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-021COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4937021) filed by MUSLIM ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Tulin, Leah) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-022LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Tulin, Leah) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-023NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MUSLIM ADVOCATES. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-548-TSC. (Tulin, Leah) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-024MOTION and Memorandum of Law in Support of Use of P.O. Box in Complaint Address by MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tulin, Leah) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-025MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Juvaria Khan, :Firm- Muslim Advocates, :Address- P.O. Box 71080, Oakland, CA 94612. Phone No. - 646-221-6732. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4937095. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Juvaria Khan in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Tulin, Leah) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-02Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (jd) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-036SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-06-077NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Parker on behalf of MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Parker, Joshua) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-098NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel F. Bousquet on behalf of MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Bousquet, Daniel) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-06-14MINUTE ORDER: Granting 4 Motion to allow Plaintiff to use a P.O. Box in the Complaint caption in lieu of its full residence address. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/14/17. (DJS) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-14MINUTE ORDER: Granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Juvaria Khan is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/14/17. (DJS) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-169NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Lauren Chapuis on behalf of MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Chapuis, Emily) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-1610NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MUSLIM ADVOCATES. Attorney Leah J. Tulin terminated. (Tulin, Leah) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-1911RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/13/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/13/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/13/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 6/19/2017 (Parker, Joshua) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-1912NOTICE of Appearance by Amir H. Ali on behalf of MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Ali, Amir) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-07-1113NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MUSLIM ADVOCATES. Attorney Daniel F. Bousquet terminated. (Bousquet, Daniel) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-1314NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Glass on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Glass, David) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-1315ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Glass, David) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-18MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order not later than 8/4/17. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/18/17. (DJS) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/4/2017. (tb) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-2016NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly M. Morrison on behalf of MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Morrison, Kelly) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-2117NOTICE of Appearance by Sirine Shebaya on behalf of MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-08-0418Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Glass, David) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-07MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 18 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint status report by October 4, 2017 advising the Court of the progress made, if any, toward resolving the issues relating to Plaintiff's FOIA request. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/7/17. (DJS) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/4/2017. (tb) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-10-0419Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Glass, David) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-06MINUTE ORDER: Granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status. The parties' Joint Status Report and proposed order shall be filed by 10/6/17. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/6/17. (DJS) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-0620Joint STATUS REPORT (Second) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Glass, David) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-12MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 20 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report by October 31, 2017, along with a proposed order for moving forward with this case. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/12/17. (DJS) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/31/2017. (tb) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-1321NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MUSLIM ADVOCATES. Attorney Emily Lauren Chapuis terminated. (Chapuis, Emily) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-3022Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Third Joint Status Report by MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Ali, Amir) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-31MINUTE ORDER: Granting 22 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. Joint Status due November 3, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/31/17. (DJS) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-10-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/3/2017. (tb) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-11-0323Joint STATUS REPORT (Third) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Glass, David) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
2017-11-15MINUTE ORDER: A status conference is hereby set for November 28, 2017 at 11:30 a.m. In addition to the U.S. Attorney defending the action, counsel from the agency shall also appear at the status conference. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/15/2017. (lctsc2). (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-16Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (tb) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-11-28Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: Status Conference held on 11/28/2017. The defendant is to provide plaintiff with an estimate on the completion of production by 12/19/2017. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report that contains both a proposed schedule and proposed order by 1/19/2018. (Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne) (jth) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-2824TRANSCRIPT OF 11/28/17 STATUS HEARING before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan held on November 28, 2017. Page Numbers: 1-32. Date of Issuance: 11/28/17. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered via Transcript Order Form at www.dcd.uscourts.gov For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/19/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/29/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/26/2018.(Wayne, Bryan) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-30MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the court's orders at the November 28, 2017 status conference, the government shall (1) provide Plaintiff with an estimate regarding the completion date of its production and (2) inform Plaintiff of the searches or search queries it has conducted or will conduct by December 19, 2017. The parties shall file another Joint Status Report on January 19, 2018. If the Plaintiff still wishes to set a summary judgment briefing schedule at the time of the filing of the January Joint Status Report, Plaintiff should so indicate in the report. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/30/2017. (lctsc2). (Entered: 11/30/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff