Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00814
Date Filed2017-05-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffPROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Protect Democracy Project submitted a FOIA request to OMB for records concerning the review by federal agencies of President Trump's travel ban before it was released. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Protect Democracy Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE 17cv815
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-021COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4937287) filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Murphy, Allison) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-02Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (jd) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-032NOTICE Certificate LCvR 7.1 by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. re 1 Complaint, (Murphy, Allison) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-033SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-034LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.;(See docket entry no. 2 to view document.) (td) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-135REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint)(Murphy, Allison) (Entered: 05/13/2017)
2017-05-136REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC..(Murphy, Allison) (Entered: 05/13/2017)
2017-05-157SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-06-028RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/25/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/24/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/22/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 5/23/2017 (Murphy, Allison) (Main Document 8 replaced on 6/5/2017) (jf). (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-099NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Joseph Berns on behalf of OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-06-0910NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Defendants. Case related to Case No. 1:17-cv-00815. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-06-0911Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-06-12MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Related Cases. It is hereby ordered that the later-numbered case, Protect Democracy Project v. Department of Justice, No. 1:17-cv-00815-BAH, shall be reassigned in accordance with Local Rule 40.5(c). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/12/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-12CASES CONSOLIDATED. Case 17-cv-814 and 17-cv-815 have been consolidated pursuant to Minute Order filed 6/12/17. From this date forward all pleadings shall be filed ONLY in lead case number 17-cv-814 APM. The parties are advised NOT to elect to SPREAD text when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails.(td) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-2112ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET.(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-2113ANSWER to Complaint filed in Docket No. 1:17-cv-815 by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-2214ORDER: Both a Complaint and Answers are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before July 6, 2017. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/22/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-06-22Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 7/6/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-07-0615Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-10MINUTE ORDER. In light of 15 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a subsequent Joint Status Report on or before August 8, 2017, and the parties shall file Joint Status Reports on the second Tuesday of every month thereafter until further order of the court. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/10/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-08-0816Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff