Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00815
Date Filed2017-05-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffPROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Protect Democracy Project submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning reviews of President Trump's travel ban before it was issued. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The Executive Office for Immigration Review told PDP that it found no records. Other components of the agency indicated that they were beginning to process the request. After hearing nothing further, Protect Democracy Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-021COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4937291) filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons, # 6 Certificate Rule LCvR 7.1)(Murphy, Allison) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-032LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (md) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-03Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (md) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-033SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-03SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (SUMMONS WERE NOT SUBMITTED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED) (md) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-044STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 4, 2017. (lcbah2) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-135REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC..(Murphy, Allison) (Entered: 05/13/2017)
2017-05-136REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC..(Murphy, Allison) (Entered: 05/13/2017)
2017-05-157SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff