Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMUSLIM ADVOCATES v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00820
Date Filed2017-05-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffMUSLIM ADVOCATES
Case DescriptionMuslim Advocates submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records from U.S. Customs and Border Protection and the Transportation Security Administration concerning eligibility for the Trusted Traveler Program in light of President Trump's travel ban. Muslim Advocates also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and took a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Muslim Advocates filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-031COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4937681) filed by MUSLIM ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Chapuis, Emily) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-032LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Chapuis, Emily) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-033NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MUSLIM ADVOCATES. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-813. (Chapuis, Emily) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-034MOTION and Memorandum of Law in Support of Use of P.O. Box in Complaint Caption Address by MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chapuis, Emily) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-035MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Juvaria Khan, :Firm- Muslim Advocates, :Address- P.O. Box 71080, Oakland, CA 94612. Phone No. - 646-221-6732. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4937798. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Juvaria Khan in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Chapuis, Emily) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-04Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (sb) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-046SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-187Case randomly reassigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Judge Tanya S. Chutkan is no longer assigned to the case as not related. (ztnr) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-06-078NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Parker on behalf of MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Parker, Joshua) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-099NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel F. Bousquet on behalf of MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Bousquet, Daniel) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-06-1910RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/13/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/13/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/13/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 6/19/2017 (Parker, Joshua) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-1911NOTICE of Appearance by Amir H. Ali on behalf of MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Ali, Amir) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-07-10MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave of Juvaria Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/10/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-10MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's 4 motion for leave to list its P.O. Box in lieu of its full office address in the caption of the complaint. Plaintiff is directed to file a version of the complaint listing its full office address UNDER SEAL. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/10/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-1112NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MUSLIM ADVOCATES. Attorney Daniel F. Bousquet terminated. (Bousquet, Daniel) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-1213SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MUSLIM ADVOCATES(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Chapuis, Emily) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-1314ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Patil, Chetan) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-14MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff on or before August 11, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/14/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-2015NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly M. Morrison on behalf of MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Morrison, Kelly) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-2116NOTICE of Appearance by Sirine Shebaya on behalf of MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-08-1017NOTICE of Appearance by Kari E. D'Ottavio on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (D'Ottavio, Kari) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-1018STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (D'Ottavio, Kari) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-11MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 18 status report, the parties shall file a further joint status report by September 15, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/11/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff