Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00823
Date Filed2017-05-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION
Case DescriptionThe Wild Horse Freedom Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the Wild Horse and Burro Program System User's Guide 4700 Series. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told the Foundation that it had found no records. The Foundation filed an administrative appeal of the agency's no records decision. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Wild Horse Freedom Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-031COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4939081) filed by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-03Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (jd) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-042SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-04ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jd) Modified on 5/4/2017 (jd). (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-043SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-084NOTICE of Appearance by C. Peter Sorenson on behalf of WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-255NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-06-066Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-217AMENDED COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT filed by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION.(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-27MINUTE ORDER granting 6 defendant's consent motion for an extension of time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by no later than July 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 27, 2017. (lcegs2) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Otherwise Response To The Amended Complaint due by 7/10/2017. (mac) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-07-078Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-10MINUTE ORDER granting 8 defendant's consent motion for extension of time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by no later than July 31, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 10, 2017. (lcegs2) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Otherwise Response To Plaintiff's Complaint due by 7/31/2017. (mac) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-259STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/25/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (lcegs1) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-07-3110Joint MOTION to Stay by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-08-01MINUTE ORDER granting 10 joint motion to stay case. The parties are directed to submit a joint status report discussing, inter alia, a proposed briefing schedule to resolve any issues that remain in dispute, by no later than August 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 1, 2017. (lcegs2) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/14/2017 (mac) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-1111Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-11MINUTE ORDER. In light of 11 the parties' joint status report, the Court directs the parties to either move to dismiss the action or file a further joint status report discussing, inter alia, a proposed briefing schedule to resolve any issues that remain in dispute by no later than September 25, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 11, 2017. (lcegs2) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-11Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint status report or other response to Court Order due by 9/25/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff