Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00824
Date Filed2017-05-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION
Case DescriptionThe Wild Horse Freedom Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning a number of specific BLM Wild Horse and Burro Program contracts. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After a number of inquiries concerning the status of the request were unsuccessful, the Wild Horse Freedom Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-031COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4939107) filed by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-03Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jd) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-042SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-073NOTICE of Appearance by C. Peter Sorenson on behalf of WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 05/07/2017)
2017-05-234NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
2017-06-065Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-06MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's 5 consent motion for an extension of time to answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by July 10, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/6/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 7/10/2017. (kt) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-07-106ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-11MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff on or before August 11, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/11/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-08-117PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE and Status Report by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-15MINUTE ORDER. Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by September 18, 2017. Plaintiff's opposition shall be filed by October 18, 2017. And defendant's reply, if necessary, shall be filed by October 30, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/15/2017.(lcabj3) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-09-188MOTION for Summary Judgment by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Declaration of Ryan Witt, # 3 Exhibit - BLM Release Letter 5/17/17)(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-10-189Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Debbie Coffey & Exhibits A - C, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
2017-10-3010Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-30MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's 10 Motion for Extension of Time to file its reply brief. Defendant shall file its reply brief by November 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/30/2017. (lcabj3) Modified event title on 10/31/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 11/14/2017. (tb) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-11-0911REPLY to opposition to motion re 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-12-04Case directly reassigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Judge Amy Berman Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2018-04-1612ORDER requiring supplemental briefing. See attached order for details. Defendant's supplement to its reply brief shall be filed on or before April 23, 2018. Plaintiff's surreply shall be filed on or before April 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 16, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-2513Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Court's Order and Defendant's Motion to Late File by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-26MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Motion for an Enlargement of Time and Defendant's Motion to Late File Response to Court's Order (ECF No. 12), it is ORDERED that Defendant's motion to late file is GRANTED and the parties' joint motion for an enlargement of time is GRANTED. Accordingly, the parties shall file a joint status report on or before May 25, 2018 advising the Court whether further proceedings are necessary in this matter. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 26, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/25/2018. (JK) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-05-2514Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-25MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before June 13, 2018 that addresses the status of the case and, if necessary, proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 25, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-06-1315Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-13MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before June 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 13, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-2616Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-26MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 16 Joint Status Report and the parties' representation that the "substantive issues in this matter have now been resolved," it is ORDERED that the pending 8 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as moot. The parties shall file another joint status report on or before August 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 26, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/29/2018. (JK) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar