Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00831
Date Filed2017-05-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FDA, the CDC, and the Office of the Surgeon General for emails discussing the relative carcinogenicity of Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4941297) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons US HH&S)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-052LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-05Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (sth) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-053SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-114RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/9/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/8/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/9/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES served on 5/8/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-315NOTICE of Appearance by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-06-026Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-02MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to 1 Plaintiff's Complaint shall be due on or before June 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/02/2017. (lcapm2) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-02Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to complaint due by 6/15/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-157ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES.(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-198ORDER: Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before July 5, 2017. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/19/2017. (lcapm2) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-19Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 7/5/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-07-059Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-06MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than September 14, 2017, which updates the court on the progress of searches and productions in response to Plaintiff's FOIA requests. The parties shall also propose a summary judgment briefing schedule, if required. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/06/2017. (lcapm2) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2017. (mac) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-09-1410Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-14MINUTE ORDER: In light of 10 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report on or before December 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/14/2017. (lcapm2) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-14Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/14/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff